Blose v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Georgeanne Blose
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00601
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remand this case to the Circuit Court for the Third Judicial Circuit, in and for Columbia County, FL. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/19/2019. (AMP)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on September 10, 2019 1:30 pm - 5:30 pm before Charles Carter.(Carter, Charles)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (PAM)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Conduct mediation hearing by 12/31/2019; Discovery due by 2/28/2020; Dispositive motions due by 3/31/2020; Pretrial statement due by 7/15/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 8/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Smith, Stephen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Georgeanne Blose. (Smith, Stephen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Baker, Aaron) Modified on 6/14/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Baker, Aaron) Modified on 6/13/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to remand to State Court by Georgeanne Blose. (Smith, Stephen)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing civil cover sheet by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, Aaron) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (PAM).
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company.(PAM) Modified on 5/21/2019 (PAM). Filed in State Court
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company filed by Georgeanne Blose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(PAM) Filed in State Court
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-601-J-39JRK. (SJB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial Circuit Columbia County Florida, case number 18-446-CA filed in State Court on 12/19/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15487672 filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, Aaron) Modified on 5/22/2019 (PAM). Counsel directed refile a civil cover sheet

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blose v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Aaron Robert Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgeanne Blose
Represented By: Stephen A. Smith
Represented By: Duane E. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?