Northfield Insurance Company v. Rockhill Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Northfield Insurance Company
Defendant: Rockhill Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00625
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
2 Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Rockhill's Motion to Dismiss by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Palmer, Brentt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rockhill Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Auto Insurance Group for Rockhill Insurance Company.. (Palmer, Brentt)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Northfield Insurance Company. (Maza, Jorge)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Northfield Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Northland Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Northfield Insurance Company for Northfield Insurance Company.. (Maza, Jorge)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's response to #10 Motion to Dismiss is due July 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/3/2019. (ADM)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Northfield Insurance Company. (Maza, Jorge) Modified on 7/2/2019 to edit text and create docket entry relationship. (TMC)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rockhill Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Auto Insurance Group for Rockhill Insurance Company.. (Palmer, Brentt)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to counsel, Adam Duke, of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (TMC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brentt Palmer on behalf of Rockhill Insurance Company (Palmer, Brentt)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Zurich Policy, #2 Exhibit B - CRN)(Young, B.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. New case number: 3:19-cv-625-J-32MCR. Judge Marcia Morales Howard no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Timothy J. Corrigan for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/19/2019. (JW)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Northfield Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Maza, Jorge)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF of service on 6/6/2019 as to Rockhill Insurance Company by Northfield Insurance Company (Maza, Jorge) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (BD).
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Rockhill Insurance Company. (BD)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-625-J-34MCR. (SJB)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Northfield Insurance Company, individually and as assignee and subrogee of First Coast Association Management, LLC.. (Maza, Jorge)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Northfield Insurance Company, individually and as assignee and subrogee of First Coast Association Management, LLC. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15508513) filed by Northfield Insurance Company, individually and as assignee and subrogee of First Coast Association Management, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Maza, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northfield Insurance Company v. Rockhill Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Holly S. Harvey
Represented By: Jorge Alexander Maza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockhill Insurance Company
Represented By: B. Richard Young
Represented By: Brentt Palmer
Represented By: Adam A. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?