Strait v. City of Neptune Beach et al
Plaintiff: Karla Strait and Brenda Karla Strait
Defendant: Harriet M Pruette, Andrew E Hyatt, Patrick W Krechowski and City of Neptune Beach
Case Number: 3:2019cv00748
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #9 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Brenda Karla Strait. (Henrichsen, Neil)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file her response to #9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss no later than August 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/14/2019. (AMP)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Brenda Karla Strait. (Henrichsen, Neil) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 8/13/2019 to edit text (PAM).
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Ex. D from Second Amended Complaint))(Birk, Edward)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Complaint by Brenda Karla Strait. (Henrichsen, Neil)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by City of Neptune Beach, Andrew E Hyatt, Patrick W Krechowski, Harriet M Pruette. (Birk, Edward)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including July 31, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 7/2/2019. (TSP)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Complaint Third Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Birk, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed in State Court on 6/13/2019) against City of Neptune Beach, Andrew E Hyatt, Patrick W Krechowski, Harriet M Pruette with Jury Demand filed by Karla Strait.(AEJ)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-748-J-39JBT. (SJB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2016-CA-007047 filed in State Court on 11/4/2016. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15611988 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Appendix Exhibit A Index, #3 Civil Cover Sheet A-1 Cover Sheet, #4 State Court COMPLAINT A-2 Verified Complaint, #5 State Court Other Documents A-4 Case Fees Paid, #6 Proposed Summons A-6 Summons, City of Neptune Beach, #7 Proposed Summons A-7 Summons, Andrew E. Hyatt, #8 Proposed Summons A-8 Summons, Patrick W. Krechowski, #9 Proposed Summons A-9 Summons, Harriet M. Pruettte, #10 State Court Other Documents A-10 Case Fees, #11 State Court Other Documents A-11 Designation of Current Mailing and Email Addresses for Service, #12 State Court Other Documents A-12 Notice of Appearance, Edward L. Birk, #13 State Court Other Documents A-13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #14 State Court Other Documents A-14 Ntoice of Hearing Ds' Motion to Dismiss, 4/4/17, #15 State Court Other Documents A-15 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, #16 State Court Other Documents Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, #17 State Court COMPLAINT A-17 Verified Amended Complaint, #18 State Court Other Documents A-18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #19 State Court Other Documents A-19 Notice of hearing, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintff's Amended Complaint, #20 State Court Other Documents A-20 Amended Notice of hearing, Ds' Motion to Dismiss P's Amended Complaint, #21 State Court Other Documents A-21 Second Amended Notice of hearing, #22 State Court Other Documents A-22 Ps' Response in Opposition to Ds' Motion to Dismiss with Incorporate Memorandum of Law, #23 State Court Other Documents A-23 Order Granting Ds' Motion to Dismiss P's First Amended Complaint, #24 State Court COMPLAINT A-24 Verified Second Amended Complaint, #25 State Court Other Documents A-25 Ds' Motion to Dismiss P's Verified Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice, #26 State Court Other Documents A-26 Ds' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss P's Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice, #27 State Court Other Documents A-27 Ds' Notice of Ripeness and Motion for Hearing on Their Motion to Dismiss P's Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice, #28 State Court Other Documents A-28 Order Directing Response to Ds' Motion to Dismiss, #29 State Court Other Documents A-29 Response to Opposition to Ds' Motion to Dismiss P's Amended Complaint with Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #30 State Court Other Documents A-30 Order of Recusal, #31 State Court Other Documents A-31 Order of Reassignment to CV-H, #32 State Court Other Documents A-33 Ds' Notice of Ripeness, and Motion to Set Hearing on their Motion to Dismiss P's Verified Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice, #33 State Court Other Documents A-34 Notice of Hearing, Ds' Notice of Ripeness and Motion to Set Hearing, #34 State Court Other Documents A-35 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing, #35 State Court Other Documents Notice of Hearing, Ds' Motion to Dismiss P's Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice, #36 State Court Other Documents A-37 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff, Joshua A. Cossey, #37 State Court Other Documents A-38 Notice of Unavailability, Joshua A. Cossey, #38 State Court Other Documents A-39 Notice of Cancellation, Ds' Motion to Dismiss P's Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice, #39 State Court Other Documents A-40 Withdraw of Notices, Notice of Cancellation of Hearing and Notice of Unavailability, #40 State Court Other Documents A-41 Ds' Objection to P's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw, #41 State Court Other Documents A-42 Motion to Withdraw as Co-Counsel, Jeremiah Blocker, #42 State Court Other Documents A-43 Amended Motion to Withdraw, Joshua A. Cossey, #43 State Court Other Documents A-44 Amended Motion to Withdraw, Jeremiah Blocker, #44 State Court Other Documents A-45 Order Granting Co-Counsel's Motion to Withdraw, #45 State Court Other Documents A-46 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #46 State Court Other Documents A-47 Notice of Appearance of Counsel, Neil L. Henrichsen, #47 State Court COMPLAINT A-48 Third Amended Complaint, #48 State Court Other Documents A-49 Notice of Appearance of Counsel, Victoria B. Kroell, #49 Exhibit Exhibit B, Ds' Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Birk, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strait v. City of Neptune Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harriet M Pruette
Represented By: Edward L. Birk
Represented By: Denise Cheri May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew E Hyatt
Represented By: Edward L. Birk
Represented By: Denise Cheri May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick W Krechowski
Represented By: Edward L. Birk
Represented By: Denise Cheri May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Neptune Beach
Represented By: Edward L. Birk
Represented By: Denise Cheri May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Strait
Represented By: Joshua A. Cossey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Karla Strait
Represented By: Joshua A. Cossey
Represented By: Victoria Blanche Kroell
Represented By: Neil L. Henrichsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?