Oestriecher et al v. The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, a foreign corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kurt Oestriecher and Sandy Oestriecher
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, a foreign corporation, Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC., a foreign limited liability company formerly known as Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD., a foreign corporation, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company and Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00798
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Kurt Oestriecher, Sandy Oestriecher. (Kane, Julie)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Kurt Oestriecher, Sandy Oestriecher re #7 Order Establishing Jurisdiction to Supplement Complaint (Kane, Julie)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Related case(s): n (McDonald, Francis)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company identifying Corporate Parent SRI USA, Inc. for Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company.. (McDonald, Francis)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Count VII of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Accompany Memorandum of Law by Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (McDonald, Francis)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants, The GoodYear Tire & Rubber Company and Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company.(McDonald, Francis)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Plaintiffs to supplement their Complaint #1 on or before September 3, 2019, with a notice that establishes this Court's jurisdiction. Failure to establish the Court's jurisdiction will lead to dismissal of this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/19/2019. (AMP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 08/05/2019 as to The Goodyear Tire Rubber Company by Kurt Oestriecher, Sandy Oestriecher (Kane, Julie) Modified text on 8/22/2019. (AEJ)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 08/06/2019 as to Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC by Kurt Oestriecher, Sandy Oestriecher (Kane, Julie) Modified text on 8/22/2019. (AEJ)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (AEJ)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-798-J-39PDB. (SJB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC., a foreign limited liability company formerly known as Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD., a foreign corporation, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, a foreign corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15647203) filed by Sandy Oestriecher, Kurt Oestriecher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Kane, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oestriecher et al v. The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, a foreign corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, a foreign corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC., a foreign limited liability company formerly known as Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD., a foreign corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Francis Morton McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC
Represented By: Francis Morton McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Oestriecher
Represented By: Julie Braman Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Oestriecher
Represented By: Julie Braman Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?