Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. et al v. Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.
Plaintiff: Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. and DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Defendant: Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00801
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #15 Counterclaims and Demand for Jury Trial by DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc..(Smith, Robert) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (BD).
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy A. Laquidara on behalf of Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (Laquidara, Cindy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Aaron Brown on behalf of Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (Brown, Jacob)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice by Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (McNamara, Megan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. by Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(McNamara, Megan)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act. Jeff E. Schwartz, James E. Doroshow, Austen C. Endersby, and Ashe P. Puri are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant with Megan A. McNamara as local counsel. Mr. Schwartz, Mr. Doroshow, Mr. Endersby, and Mr. Puri shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/2/2019. (MDC)
August 1, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jeff E. Schwartz, James E. Doroshow, Austen C. Endersby, Ashe P. Puri, appearing on behalf of Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (Filing fee total $600 receipt number JAX031379.) Related document: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Jeff E. Schwartz, James E. Doroshow, Austen C. Endersby, and Ashe P. Puri to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Jeff E. Schwartz, James E. Doroshow, Austen C. Endersby, and Ashe P. Puri to appear pro hac vice by Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (McNamara, Megan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Defendant Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.'s Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including 8/8/2019 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Design Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial (Doc. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/26/2019. (MDC)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to Counsels Jeff E. Schwartz and Austen C. Endersby of Local Rule 2.02 (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to extend time to Respond to Complaint by Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (McNamara, Megan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on July 11, 2019 by DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. as to Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (Smith, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act. Jason G. Sheasby, Ellisen S. Turner, and Andrew E. Krause are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs with R. Troy Smith as local counsel. Mr. Sheasby, Mr. Turner, and Mr. Krause shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so.Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/15/2019. (MDC)
July 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jason G. Sheasby, Andrew E. Krause, and Ellisen S. Turner, appearing on behalf of DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. (Filing fee $450 receipt number JAX031225.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Jason G. Sheasby, Ellisen S. Turner and Andrew E. Krause to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Jason G. Sheasby, Ellisen S. Turner and Andrew E. Krause to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (BD)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BD)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsels Jason G. Sheasby, Ellisen S. Turner, and Andrew E. Krause of Local Rule 2.02 (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-801-J-34JRK. (SJB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Design Patent Infringement against Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15651851) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Smith, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. et al v. Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Depuy Synthes Products, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Troy Smith
Represented By: Jason G. Sheasby
Represented By: Andrew E. Krause
Represented By: Cole Carlson
Represented By: Ellisen S. Turner
Represented By: Stephen Gregory Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Troy Smith
Represented By: Jason G. Sheasby
Represented By: Andrew E. Krause
Represented By: Cole Carlson
Represented By: Ellisen S. Turner
Represented By: Stephen Gregory Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Anne McNamara
Represented By: Jacob Aaron Brown
Represented By: Austen C. Endersby
Represented By: Cindy A. Laquidara
Represented By: Jeff E. Schwartz
Represented By: Ashe P. Puri
Represented By: James E. Doroshow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?