Conquest Offshore BV et al v. M/V Pretty Team et al
Plaintiff: Conquest Offshore BV and Conquest Offshore Operations BV
Defendant: Parakou Shipping, Ltd., Pretty Team Shipping SA, M/V Pretty Team and Ameropa AG
Case Number: 3:2019cv00824
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 28 TRANSFER to the Southern District of Alabama (SJW)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendant Ameropa AG; GRANTING #26 Renewed Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue to United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama, Southern Division and Abatement of Case Management Report Deadline; DENYING AS MOOT #23 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue to United States District of Alabama, Southern Division. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Southern District of Alabama, Southern Division. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/5/2019. (AMP)
September 4, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to transfer case (renewed) by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brock, Lindsey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV re 24 Order on motion to transfer case of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Ameropa AG (Brock, Lindsey)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER: #23 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. After Plaintiffs serve Defendant Ameropa AG, Plaintiffs shall supplement the #23 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue to state whether Defendant Ameropa AG consents to the transfer to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama, Southern District. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/23/2019. (AMP)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to transfer case to Southern District of Alabama, Southern Division by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brock, Lindsey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #16 Amended Complaint in rem claim by Pretty Team Shipping SA.(Little, Ryon) Modified on 8/14/2019 to edit filer (PAM).
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #16 Amended Complaint Rule B Attachment - quasi in rem claim by Pretty Team Shipping SA.(Little, Ryon) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit text and link (PAM).
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #16 Amended Complaint in personam claim by Parakou Shipping, Ltd.(Little, Ryon) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit text (PAM).
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #16 Amended Complaint in personam claim by Pretty Team Shipping SA.(Little, Ryon) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit text (PAM).
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Brock, Lindsey)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by M/V Pretty Team Verified Statement of Right or Interest (De Leo, Charles)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE executed on 7/12/2019 as to M/V Pretty by Conquest Offshore. (AEJ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 7/2/2019 by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV as to M/V Pretty Team. (AEJ)
July 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Consent to Release of Vessel by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV re #8 Order (Brock, Lindsey) Modified text on 7/15/2019. (AEJ)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 PROCESS OF ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT ISSUED against M/V PRETTY TEAM, IMO # 9639763, Flag Marshall Islands, Gross Tonnage 23,232, Deadweight, 35,200 t, Length 179.88m. breadth extreme 29.8m, year built 2013; her engines, apparel, tackle, et al., located in the Port of Jacksonville, Florida and berthed at the Northside Generating Plant, along the St. Johns River. (AEJ)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to M/V Pretty Team, Parakou Shipping, Ltd., Pretty Team Shipping SA. (AEJ)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 motion to appoint substitute custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/12/2019. (ASL)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to issue arrest and attachment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/12/2019. (ASL)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the issuance of the process of attachment and garnishment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/12/2019. (ASL)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 motion for the issuance of the warrant of arrest and/or summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/12/2019. (ASL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Verification by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Brock, Lindsey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brock, Lindsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem , Emergency MOTION for issuance of Attachment by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Directing Issuance of Process of Attachment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Directing Issuance of Warrant, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Emergency Motion, #4 Exhibit Process of Attachment, #5 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(Brock, Lindsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-824-J-39PDB. (SJB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/V Pretty Team, Parakou Shipping, Ltd., Pretty Team Shipping SA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15679363) filed by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Brock, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conquest Offshore BV et al v. M/V Pretty Team et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parakou Shipping, Ltd.
Represented By: Ryon L. Little
Represented By: Charles G. De Leo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pretty Team Shipping SA
Represented By: Ryon L. Little
Represented By: Charles G. De Leo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Pretty Team
Represented By: Ryon L. Little
Represented By: Charles G. De Leo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameropa AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conquest Offshore BV
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Represented By: Lindsay C. Tropnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conquest Offshore Operations BV
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Represented By: Lindsay C. Tropnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?