Peeples El v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Diane Peeples El
Defendant: Douglas C. Zahm and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2019cv00921
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
2 Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Mail address to Diane Peeples El marked Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice. Mail resent to Diane Peeples El at P.O. Box 77618, Jacksonville, FL 32226. This address is reflected on the envelope of Doc. #7. (PAM)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to the Court by Diane Peeples El (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Mailing Envelope)(PAM) Titled: Notice of Removal
September 16, 2019 Mail addressed to Diane Peeples El marked return to sender not deliverable as addressed unable to forward re: #6 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Left message with Ms. Peeoples' family member regarding the parcel of mail being returned. Deputy Clerk requested that Ms. Peeples file a notice of change of address if applicable. (PAM) Modified on 9/18/2019 (PAM). Deputy Clerk hand delivered to plaintiff at the intake desk on 9/18/19. Per Plaintiff, the address and email address have both changed. She will submit a notice of change of address ASAP.
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER taking under advisement #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's amended complaint due by 10/2/19. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 9/11/2019. (TAM)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 3:19-cv-921-J-39JBT. Judge Marcia Morales Howard no longer assigned to the case. (BD)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of recusal. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/12/2019. (JW)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Diane Peeples El. (BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Douglas C. Zahm filed by Diane Peeples El. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (IFP filed, no service copies)(BD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peeples El v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas C. Zahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Peeples El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?