Bowles v. Inch et al
Petitioner: Gary Ray Bowles
Respondent: Attorney General Ashley Moody and Secretary Mark S. Inch
Case Number: 3:2019cv00936
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of USCA DISMISSAL as to #13 Notice of appeal filed by Gary Ray Bowles. EOD: 09/25/2019; Issued as mandate. USCA number: 19-13150. (AFC)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 Notification from the U.S. Court of Appeals, 11th Circuit, that WRIT OF CERTIORARI has been denied by the U.S. Supreme Court as to #13 Notice of appeal filed by Gary Ray Bowles. Issued on 8/27/2019. The court's mandate having previously issued, no further action will be taken by this court. (EAM)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 USCA ORDER DENYING motion for leave to file a second or successive habeas petition and DENYING petitioner's motion for a stay of execution. Signed by USCA Judge. Entered on docket 8/22/2019. USCA number: 19-13149-P. (EAM)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of USCA DENYING Bowles' emergency motion for a stay of execution as to #13 Notice of appeal filed by Gary Ray Bowles. EOD: 8/21/2019. USCA number: 19-13150-P. (EAM)
August 19, 2019 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving Notice of Appeal on 8/19/2019 re #13 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 19-13150-P. (EAM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #13 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (Attachments: #1 Docket sheet, #2 Notice of Appeal, #3 USDC Order, #4 USDC Judgment)(EAM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Clerk's Judgment, #11 Order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdictionOrder on motion to stay by Gary Ray Bowles. Filing fee not paid. (Backhus, Terri)
August 18, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/18/2019. (JLD)
August 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting to the extent stated #8 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss the Successive Habeas Petition for Lack of Jurisdiction and dismissing without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction #1 Petitioner's Emergency Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and 2241 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying as moot #2 Petitioner's Emergency Motion for a Stay of Execution; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/18/2019. (JLD)
August 17, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 Emergency MOTION to stay re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus EXECUTION SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 22, 2019, #8 First MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction sucessive habeas petition filed without authorization from the Eleenth Circuit filed by Gary Ray Bowles. (Backhus, Terri)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 Emergency MOTION to stay re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus EXECUTION SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 22, 2019 filed by Mark S. Inch. (Millsaps, Charmaine)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction sucessive habeas petition filed without authorization from the Eleenth Circuit by Mark S. Inch, Ashley Moody. (Millsaps, Charmaine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Donahue on behalf of Mark S. Inch, Ashley Moody (Donahue, Jennifer)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance as counsel of record Appearance by Charmaine M. Millsaps on behalf of Mark S. Inch, Ashley Moody (Millsaps, Charmaine)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Respondents to file a response to the Petition and Motion for a Stay by 12:00 p.m. on Friday, August 16, 2019; Petitioner may reply by 5:00 p.m. on Saturday, August 17, 2019; directions to the Clerk. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/14/2019. (JLD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Gunn on behalf of Gary Ray Bowles (Gunn, Sean)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-936-J-32JBT. (SJB)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION to stay re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus EXECUTION SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 22, 2019 by Gary Ray Bowles. (Backhus, Terri)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 113A-15801541) filed by Gary Ray Bowles. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Backhus, Terri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowles v. Inch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General Ashley Moody
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Donahue
Represented By: Charmaine M. Millsaps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Mark S. Inch
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Donahue
Represented By: Charmaine M. Millsaps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Ray Bowles
Represented By: Kelsey Peregoy
Represented By: Sean Gunn
Represented By: Terri Lynn Backhus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?