Miller v. Government Employees Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Lorraine Miller
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company and Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01133
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Lorraine Miller. (Underwood, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: Upon review of #7 Defendant's Response to the Court's Order Dated October 7, 2019, the Court's sua sponte inquiry into its subject matter jurisdiction is satisfied. (MAM)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #4 Order Dated October 7, 2019 filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McCoy, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. (McCoy, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED: Defendants shall have up to and including October 21, 2019, to provide the Court with sufficient information so that it can determine whether it has jurisdiction over this action. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/7/2019. (MAM)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Lorraine Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (1 of 4), #3 Exhibit B (2 of 4), #4 Exhibit B (3 of 4), #5 Exhibit B (4 of 4), #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D) (Originally filed in State Court) (BD)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-1133-J-34JRK. (SJB)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, case number 16-2019-CA-5956 filed in State Court on 08/21/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15989181 filed by GEICO Indemnity Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court COMPLAINT, #4 State Court COMPLAINT, #5 State Court COMPLAINT, #6 State Court COMPLAINT, #7 State Court COMPLAINT, #8 State Court COMPLAINT, #9 State Court Docket Sheet, #10 State Court Other Documents, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(McCoy, Michael) Modified text on 10/3/2019 (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Government Employees Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael David McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael David McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael David McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael David McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Miller
Represented By: Robert R. Underwood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?