Hurst v. Flesher et al
Plaintiff: Wilbert R. Hurst
Defendant: Officer Brown, Whitney A Flesher, John Doe, Lt. Smith, M. Willforth, M Buchanan and Warden Kevin D. Jordan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01149
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Toomey. New Case Number: 3:19-cv-1149-TJC-JBT. (KKH)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00244. File received electronically
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The magistrate judge's report and recommendation (ECF No. #13) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order of the court. The plaintiff's motion (ECF No. #5) to transfer this case to the Middle District is GRANTED. The clerk shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 10/7/19. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. In light of the foregoing, and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and 1406(a), it is respectfully RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs motion to transfer, ECF No. #5, be GRANTED and this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. - R&R flag set (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/10/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 09/12/2019. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN400037518. Fee status updated to paid. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order **Duplicate - ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time; granting #10 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 9/3/2019. (lsd) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time, ECF No. #9, is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time, ECF No. #10, is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until 10/4/2019, to either: (1) file a motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis, supported by a computer printout of the transactions in Plaintiff's inmate bank account for the 6-month period of time preceding the initiation of this case, or (2) pay the full amount of the filing fee ($400.00 if paid in full). The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 10/4/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 9/3/19. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
August 29, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Extend Time. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time by WILBERT R HURST. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
August 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Second MOTION to Extend Time. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Second Motion for Extension of Time by WILBERT R HURST. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time, ECF No. #7, is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until 8/2/2019, to either: (1) file a motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis, supported by a computer printout of the transactions in Plaintiff's inmate bank account for the 6- month period of time preceding the initiation of this case, or (2) pay the full amount of the filing fee ($400.00 if paid in full). The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff''s compliance with this Order, or no later than 8/2/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 7/2/19. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
June 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by WILBERT R HURST. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Ruling on Plaintiff's motion to transfer this case, ECF No. #5, is DEFERRED pending payment of the filing fee or the filing of an in forma pauperis motion. Plaintiff has until 7/2/2019, to either: (1) file a motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis, supported by a computer printout of the transactions in Plaintiff's inmate bank account for the 6- month period of time preceding the initiation of this case, or (2) pay the full amount of the filing fee ($400.00 if paid in full). The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 7/2/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/20/19. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
June 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to MIDDLE DISTRICT. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to MIDDLE DISTRICT by WILBERT R HURST. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/26/2019). (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application packet for requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until 7/2/2019, to either: (1) file a motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis, supported by a computer printout of the transactions in Plaintiff's inmate bank account for the 6- month period of time preceding the initiation of this case, or (2) pay the full amount of the filing fee ($400.00 if paid in full). If Plaintiff no longer desires to proceed with this case, Plaintiff must file a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) by the same deadline. Plaintiff's motion to exceed the page limit, ECF No. #3, is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until 6/28/2019, in which to respond to this Order and advise whether or not he opposes the transfer of this case to the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 7/2/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/3/19. (blb) *Forms Provided As Directed* [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
May 29, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO EXCEED THE 25 PAGE LIMIT. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
May 29, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO EXCEED THE 25 PAGE LIMIT by WILBERT R HURST. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROWN, M BUCHANAN, JOHN DOE, WHITNEY A FLESHER, KEVIN D JORDAN, SMITH, M WILLFORTH filed by WILBERT R HURST. (blb) *No Copies, No IFP* [Transferred from flnd on 10/7/2019.] Modified to edit font color on 10/7/2019 (KKH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurst v. Flesher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney A Flesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Willforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Kevin D. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert R. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?