Warner et al v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amanda Denise Brennan and Christine Brennan Warner
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01239
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Case management and scheduling order by Quicken Loans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rock Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Burr & Forman LLP, Other Affiliate Quicken Loans, Inc., Other Affiliate Matthew Mitchell, Other Affiliate Amrock Title Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Michael W Smith for Quicken Loans, Inc. (Smith, Michael). Modified on 12/20/2019 to notify counsel's office to use correct case number on future pleadings (JSG).
December 18, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Case management and scheduling order by Amanda Denise Brennan, Christine Brennan Warner identifying Corporate Parent Burr & Forman LLP, Corporate Parent Quicken Loans, Inc., Corporate Parent Marks Gray, P.A., Other Affiliate Michael Smith, Other Affiliate Christine Brennan Warner, Other Affiliate Amanda Denise Brennan, Other Affiliate Gerald W. Weedon for Amanda Denise Brennan, Christine Brennan Warner.. (McEwen, Logan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding Duval County Tax Collector's tax bills by Amanda Denise Brennan, Christine Brennan Warner. (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(McEwen, Logan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 Counter MOTION for judgment on the pleadings by Amanda Denise Brennan, Christine Brennan Warner. (McEwen, Logan)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: The deadline for filing the certificate of interested persons and disclosure statement is 12/19/19; the deadline for providing mandatory initial disclosures is 12/23/19; the deadline for filing any motion to add parties or amend pleadings is 12/23/19; the deadline for disclosing the plaintiff's experts and expert report is 12/23/19; the deadline for disclosing the defendant's experts and expert report is 1/21/20; the deadline for completing all discovery and filing any motion to compel is 2/3/20; the deadline for participating in mediation is 2/14/20; the deadline for filing any dispositive and Daubert motions is 3/2/20; the deadline for filing all other motions and the joint final pretrial statement is 5/18/20; the final pretrial conference is scheduled for 6/1/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5B; the non-jury trial is scheduled for the July 2020 term (the parties may provide proposed dates for a date certain). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia Barksdale on December 13, 2019. (ASL)
December 4, 2019 Filing 20 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-1239-J-PDB. Judge Brian J. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 12/3/2019. (AMP)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding of Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc. by Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Amanda Denise Brennan, Christine Brennan Warner. (McEwen, Logan) Modified on 11/26/2019 to edit text (PAM).
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (McEwen, Logan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #12 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Amanda Denise Brennan, Christine Brennan Warner. (McEwen, Logan)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER directing the clerk to terminate #4 the defendant's motion for an extension of time to respond to #3 the complaint in light of #11 the notice withdrawing the motion and #9 the timeliness of the original answer under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c)(2). The defendant need not respond further to 6, 10 the endorsed orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 11/8/2019. (KNR)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Quicken Loans, Inc.(Smith, Michael) Modified on 11/12/2019 to edit text (PAM).
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Quicken Loans, Inc. re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint filed by Quicken Loans, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER directing the defendant to comply with the endorsed order entered on October 29, 2019, by November 15, 2019, or face an order to show cause. Although #9 the answer has been filed, the #4 motion for an extension of time to file the answer remains pending. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on November 8, 2019. (ASL)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint by Quicken Loans, Inc.(Smith, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Quicken Loans, Inc. (Smith, Michael) Modified on 11/4/2019 to edit text (PAM).
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER directing the defendant to supplement #4 its motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint by November 6, 2019, to comply with Local Rules 3.01(g) and 4.02(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on October 29, 2019. (ASL)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of change of address by Michael Wallace Smith (Smith, Michael)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Quicken Loans, Inc. (PAM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Originally filed in state court
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Quicken Loans, Inc. filed by Christine Brennan Warner, Amanda Denise Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(PAM)Filed in State Court
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-1239-J-39PDB. (SJB)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County, case number 2019-CA-006520 filed in State Court on 09/13/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16070607 filed by Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner et al v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Wallace Smith
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Mitchell
Represented By: Summer Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Denise Brennan
Represented By: Gerald W. Weedon
Represented By: Logan Kyle McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Brennan Warner
Represented By: Gerald W. Weedon
Represented By: Logan Kyle McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?