Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC v. Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC and Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems, LLC
Defendant: Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01313
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #1 the complaint and joint motion for an extension of time to conduct the case management conference and file the case management report. The defendant must respond to #1 the complaint by February 7, 2020. The parties must conduct the case management conference and file the case management report by February 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia Barksdale on January 9, 2020. (ASL)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report and Conduct Case Management Conference by Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.. (Walsh, Sean) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified to edit text on 1/8/2020 (KKH).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. The defendant must respond to the complaint by January 10, 2020. Signe by Magistrate Judge Patricia Barksdale on December 4, 2019.(ASL)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.. (Walsh, Sean)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Patrick Walsh on behalf of Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. (Walsh, Sean)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Eric Bilik on behalf of Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. (Bilik, Robert)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.. (KKH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (KKH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-1313-J-32PDB. (SJB)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16129265) filed by Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US Patent No. 8,534,551 B2, #2 Exhibit B-Exemplary Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC v. Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Patrick Walsh
Represented By: Robert Eric Bilik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?