Tenorio et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Marcelo Tenorio and Kelli Adriana Lima
Defendant: Field Office Directo Lisa Bradley, Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan, Field Office Directo Michael W. Meade, Acting Director Matthew T Albence, Lieutenant Messer and Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Respondent: Matthew T Albence, Lisa Bradley, Michael W. Meade, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01332
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
2 Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER staying case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close the file. The Temporary Restraining Order remains in full force and effect until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 12/2/2019. (JW)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon review of the #19 Joint Notice Regarding Stay, the parties are relieved of the obligation to file any further briefs in this matter until ordered to do so. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 11/29/2019. (JW)
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Kelli Adriana Lima, Marcelo Tenorio re #18 Order on motion to extend timeMotion Hearing (Joint Notice Regarding Stay) (Dominguez, Anthony)
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: MOTION HEARING held on 11/25/2019; granting #15 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Response and to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Response due November 29, 2019. Reply due December 4, 2019. The hearing is continued to December 16, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Notice regarding status due November 27, 2019. With the agreement of the parties, the temporary restraining order is extended. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER regarding #15 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Response and to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing. A hearing on the motion is set for today, November 25, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. The parties shall appear telephonically by calling toll free at 888-684-8852. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 5822282. You will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1913 followed by the # (pound) key. Respondents are relieved of the obligation of filing a response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction today. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 11/25/2019. (JW)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Kelli Adriana Lima, Marcelo Tenorio (Notice of Filing Petitioner's Appendix) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petitioner's Appendix)(Dominguez, Anthony)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to extend time to File Response and Motion to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Matthew T Albence, Lisa Bradley, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Lieutenant Messer, Kelli Adriana Lima, Kevin K. McAleenan, Michael W. Meade, Marcelo Tenorio. (Cunningham, Collette)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/22/2019. Court Reporter: Shelli Kozachenko (JW)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of compliance with Local Rule 4.05(b)(5) by Kelli Adriana Lima, Marcelo Tenorio (Dominguez, Anthony)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of service by Kelli Adriana Lima, Marcelo Tenorio re #8 Summons issued, #6 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order and stay of removal, #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus . (Prada, Mark)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Kelli Adriana Lima, Marcelo Tenorio re #10 Certificate of service is withdrawn and stricken (Prada, Mark)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of service by Kelli Adriana Lima, Marcelo Tenorio re #8 Summons issued, #6 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order and stay of removal, #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus . (Prada, Mark)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic status conference set for today, November 22, 2019, at 3:00 PM before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Matthew T Albence, Lisa Bradley, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Lieutenant Messer, Kevin K. McAleenan, Michael W. Meade. (RH)
November 21, 2019 FEES paid by Kelli Adriana Lima, Marcelo Tenorio (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number JAX032096) (AFC)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER. Consistent with Petitioners' counsel's representation to the Clerk of Court today, counsel is directed to mail the filing fee via overnight delivery to the Clerk of Court so that it arrives tomorrow, November 21, 2019. Summonses will issue upon receipt of the filing fee. Once the summonses are issued and service is complete, counsel shall immediately file a proof of service for each Respondent. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 11/20/2019. (MAM)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part and taking under advisement in part #4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction. Marcelo Tenorio's deportation proceedings are stayed and Respondents are enjoined from removing him from the Middle District of Florida and from deporting him as stated in the TRO. A hearing will be held on Monday, 12/2/2019, at 10:30 a.m. to determine whether to convert the TRO to preliminary injunction; Respondents shall respond to the Motion on or before 11/25/2019, at 4:00 p.m. Tenorio shall serve Respondents and file a notice of compliance when complete. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 11/19/2019. (MAM)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Marcia Morales Howard. New case number: 3:19-cv-1332-J-34JBT. Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order and stay of removal by Kelli Adriana Lima, Marcelo Tenorio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Declarations, #2 Exhibit B - I-212 Filing, #3 Exhibit C - MTR Filing and Decision, #4 Exhibit D - I-130 Receipts and Approval, #5 Exhibit E, Order, Camarena)(Dominguez, Anthony)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (MGG)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-1332-J-20JBT. (SJB)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Verified PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpusand Complaint for APA Judicial Review - Federal filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Appendix Petitioner's Appendix; PDF removed per Chambers)(Dominguez, Anthony) Modified on 11/18/2019 contacted counsel in regards to filing redacted appendix. Counsel to refile redacted version of the appendix. (TSW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenorio et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelo Tenorio
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Adriana Lima
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo Lisa Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo Michael W. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Matthew T Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T Albence
Represented By: Collette Bridget Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lisa Bradley
Represented By: Collette Bridget Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael W. Meade
Represented By: Collette Bridget Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Collette Bridget Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Collette Bridget Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?