Ramsey v. Walchle et al
Plaintiff: Sean Ramsey
Defendant: Tough Gear, Inc. and Kurt Walchle
Case Number: 3:2019cv01340
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kurt Walchle. (Osgathorpe, John)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sean Ramsey by Tough Gear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BRZN Paracord Bullet Bracelets - Chicago Company, #2 Exhibit B - First Office Action Rejecting Appl - Bullet Bracelet, #3 Exhibit C - Final Office Action Rejecting Application - Bullet Bracelet, #4 Exhibit D - Rejection of Motion to Reconsider - Bullet Bracelet)(Osgathorpe, John)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sean Ramsey by Kurt Walchle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BRZN Paracord Bullet Bracelets - Chicago Company, #2 Exhibit B - First Office Action Rejecting Appl - Bullet Bracelet, #3 Exhibit C - Final Office Action Rejecting Application - Bullet Bracelet, #4 Exhibit D - Rejection of Motion to Reconsider - Bullet Bracelet)(Osgathorpe, John)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF of service executed on 11/27/2019 as to Tough Gear, Inc. by Sean Ramsey (Wasylik, Dineen). Modified on 12/11/2019 to edit text (JSG).
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF of service executed on 11/22/2019 as to Kurt Walchle by Sean Ramsey (Wasylik, Dineen). Modified on 12/11/2019 to edit text (JSG).
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (JSG)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Tough Gear, Inc., Kurt Walchle. (JSG)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-1340-J-32JRK. (SJB)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tough Gear, Inc., Kurt Walchle with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16152452) filed by Sean Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Kurt Walchle, #5 Proposed Summons Tough Gear, Inc.)(Wasylik, Dineen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsey v. Walchle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tough Gear, Inc.
Represented By: John David Osgathorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Walchle
Represented By: John David Osgathorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Ramsey
Represented By: Dineen Pashoukos Wasylik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?