El v. State of Florida, Sheriff of Duval County et al
Plaintiff: Aries-Oba El
Defendant: Steven C. Fraser, Robert Gerard, State of Florida, Sheriff of Duval County and Gary Leonard Wilkinson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01350
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), construed as an Amended Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and #6 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/8/2020. (BHC)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER vacating #5 Order to Show Cause in light of the #6 Amended Complaint and #7 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that were filed December 26, 2019 but docketed January 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/6/2020. (BHC)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff; no later than 2/3/2020, Plaintiff shall file a written show cause response stating why the Court should not recommend that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute; Plaintiff must also comply with the #3 Order by 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/2/2020. (BHC) Modified on 1/6/2020 to edit text (JSG). VACATED per Court Order #8.
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of indigency by Aries-Oba El. (AEJ)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven C. Fraser, Robert Gerard, State of Florida, Sheriff of Duval County, Gary Leonard Wilkinson filed by Aries-Oba El. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Aries-Oba El. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(AEJ)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file the attached Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) or pay the filing fee no later than 12/27/2019; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint no later than 12/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (BHC)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Aries-Oba El. (JSG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, titled 'Notice of Removal' against all Defendants filed by Aries-Oba El (no service copies received). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit)(JSG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El v. State of Florida, Sheriff of Duval County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gerard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida, Sheriff of Duval County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Leonard Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aries-Oba El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?