D'Amico v. Wheeler et al
Plaintiff: Steven F. D'Amico
Defendant: S.R.N. D. Smith, Ramon Bassa, Joseph Edwards, Steven H Wheeler and Mark S. Inch
Case Number: 3:2019cv01422
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
Presiding Judge: Henry Lee Adams
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of change of address by Steven F. D'Amico (PAM)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis and assessing the $350 filing fee; denying as moot #13 Plaintiff's request for extension of time; directing Plaintiff to submit five copies of the Complaint for service of process by 2/20/2020; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 1/17/2020. (CAW)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE to the Court and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for IFP by Steven F. D'Amico. (PAM)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Steven F. D'Amico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(PAM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee or file an affidavit of indigency by 1/16/2020; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/13/2019. (CAW)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/11/2019. (MO)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida (Tallahassee). Case assigned to District Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New Case Number: 3:19-cv-1422-J-25JBT. (RH)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00445. File received electronically
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The Magistrate Judge's #5 Report and Recommendation is adopted and incorporated by reference in this Order. This case shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, and the Clerk shall take necessary steps to effect the transfer. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 12/10/2019. (toy) [Transferred from flnd on 12/10/2019.]
November 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (No responses filed). (MB) [Transferred from flnd on 12/10/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by STEVEN F D'AMICO. Address changed from: RECEPTION AND MEDICAL CENTER PO BOX 628 LAKE BUTLER, FL 32054, to: WAKULLA CORRECTIONAL INSTITION 110 MELALEUCA DR CRAWFORDVILLE, FL 32327. ECF#5 Re-mailed accordingly. (toy) [Transferred from flnd on 12/10/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Recommended that this case be transferred to the United States District for the Middle District of Florida, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) or 1404(a). That the clerk be directed to close this file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/10/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/7/2019. (sdw) [Transferred from flnd on 12/10/2019.]
October 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #4 RESPONSE TO #3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (MB) [Transferred from flnd on 12/10/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO #3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (MB) [Transferred from flnd on 12/10/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/18/2019. Show Cause Response due by 10/2/2019. (sdw) [Transferred from flnd on 12/10/2019.]
September 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fees not paid). (MB) [Transferred from flnd on 12/10/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, STEVEN F D'AMICO. (MB) [Transferred from flnd on 12/10/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RAMON BASSA, JOSEPH EDWARDS, MARK S INCH, D SMITH, STEVEN H WHEELER, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fees not paid). (MB) [Transferred from flnd on 12/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Amico v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.R.N. D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Bassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven H Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven F. D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?