Feng et al v. United States of America (IRS)
Petitioner: Asian Game, Inc., Twins Feng, LLC, K Feng, LLC, New Brother Place, Inc., Kenny Feng, Inc., Dan Dong, LLC, Lucas Feng Shi, Inc., Dong Feng, Lucas Feng, LLC and Ken Feng
Respondent: United States of America (IRS) and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019mc00034
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Respondent shall file a reply, not exceeding 15 pages in length, on or before February 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/24/2020. (MM)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File a Reply of 15 pages or less by February 28, 2020 filed by Dong Feng. (Fallgatter, Curtis)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File a Reply of 15 pages or less by February 28, 2020 by United States of America. (Nasta, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Dong Feng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Fallgatter, Curtis)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension for Response to Motion to Dismiss. Petitioner's response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss is due by February 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/4/2020. (MM)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by All Defendants. (Fallgatter, Curtis)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Special Agent, #2 Exhibit B. Search Consent Form)(Nasta, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 CORRECTED MOTION to quash IRS summons filed by K Feng, LLC, Asian Game, Inc., Lucas Feng Shi, Inc., Dong Feng, Twins Feng, LLC, New Brother Place, Inc., Lucas Feng, LLC, Dan Dong, LLC, Kenny Feng, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fallgatter, Curtis) Modified text on 12/30/2019 (BD).
December 30, 2019 FEES paid by Asian Game, Inc., Dan Dong, LLC, Dong Feng, K Feng, LLC, Kenny Feng, Inc., Lucas Feng Shi, Inc., Lucas Feng, LLC, New Brother Place, Inc., Twins Feng, LLC (Filing fee $47.00 receipt number JAX032339) (AFC)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Scott Fallgatter on behalf of Asian Game, Inc., Dan Dong, LLC, Dong Feng, K Feng, LLC, Kenny Feng, Inc., Lucas Feng Shi, Inc., New Brother Place, Inc., Twins Feng, LLC (Fallgatter, Curtis)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to quash IRS summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fallgatter, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feng et al v. United States of America (IRS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Asian Game, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Twins Feng, LLC
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: K Feng, LLC
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New Brother Place, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenny Feng, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dan Dong, LLC
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lucas Feng Shi, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dong Feng
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lucas Feng, LLC
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ken Feng
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America (IRS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: John Paul Nasta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?