Beck v. Elavon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: GARY M BECK and Gary M. Beck
Defendant: ELAVON, INC., U.S. BANK, N.A. and IAN DRYSDALE
Case Number: 3:2020cv00078
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Plaintiff's reply, limited to 5 pages, may be filed no later than 4/3/2020. Although the Court views defendants' response in opposition to plaintiff's motion for leave to file a reply #11 as a pre-emptive sur-reply, at their option, defendants may file a sur-reply, limited to 5 pages, no later than 4/15/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/25/2020. (SRW)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of #8 Motion to Remand filed by Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Hayden, Brian)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of #8 Motion to Remand by Gary M. Beck (Pickles, Joseph). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified on 3/20/2020 to edit text and docket entry relationship (JSG).
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Hayden, Brian)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gary M. Beck. (Pickles, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2020: #1 Exhibit 1) (JSG). Modified on 3/2/2020 to separate exhibit from main document. Reminded counsel to upload exhibit separate from main document in the future (JSG).
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bank Corp. for Elavon, Inc., Ian Drysdale, U.S. Bank, N.A... (Hayden, Brian)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Margulies on behalf of Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Margulies, Richard)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint by Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A..(JSG)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. with jury demand filed by Gary M. Beck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(JSG)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-78-J-32PDB. (SJB)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SEVENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, case number CA19-0384 filed in State Court on 03/22/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16410206 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet DOCKET SHEET, #4 State Court Other Documents EXHIBIT A, #5 State Court Other Documents EXHIBITS B-G, #6 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Hayden, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Elavon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAVON, INC.
Represented By: Brian Lee Hayden
Represented By: Richard N. Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Brian Lee Hayden
Represented By: Richard N. Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAN DRYSDALE
Represented By: Brian Lee Hayden
Represented By: Richard N. Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY M BECK
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Pickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary M. Beck
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Pickles
Represented By: Michael Fox Orr
Represented By: John Michael Traynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?