Raymond v. Klausner Lumber One, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Johnnie Raymond, Levon Cherry, Jason Harlow, Kristopher Chesser, Patrick Brown, Joseph B. Jones, Helmut Thomay, Marcus Grant, Sergio Graham, Andrea Dennis, William McClain, Tony Sesson, Kirby Arrington, Charles Frierson, Reuben Graham, Timothy Gardner, Cornelius Turner, Gregory Donaldson, Kacee Dillbeck, James Allen, Johnny Fortenberry, Corey Harris, Alicia Horne, Travis Dennis, Daniel DiRoma, David Leon, Michael Turley, Ronketrick Jordan, Jasper L. Hunter, Tasha Handy, Patrick Williams, Michael Herrmann, Shonte Myrick, Edward Morgan, Anthony DiRoma, James Love, Charles Blanton, Bruce Cobb, Chris Webb, Djuan Ivey, Jonathan Richardson, Wilbur Robinson, Bobby Wimbush, Allen Tull, Norman Price, Stacey Donaldson, Philip J. Pettey, Sr., Liviut Zdrobau, Curley L. Jackson, Michael Whitaker, Robert Herbst, Cecil Watterson, Patrick C. Hammack, Donald A. Thomas, Kenneth A. Roberts, Jimil Richardson, Robert Davis, Walter Miles, Shaneka Harrison, Mark Gooden, George Williams, Tillman Raymond, James Campbell, Justin Palmatier, Jared Coody, Leroy Stacey, James K. Brown, Dominique Williams, Gary Turner, Antoine Hunter, Harmon Gervin, Jake Latner, Shannon Kellogg, Rodney Raga, Terry Jackson, Scott Elias, Michael Lewis, Rondell McGee, Orient Livingston, Charles Bernazzani, Alonzo Strawder, Ronnie Bridges, Frederick Williams and Jessica Watts
Defendant: Christoph Schaetz, Klausner Lumber One, LLC, Klausner Holding USA, Inc., Klausner Lumber Two, LLC and Leopold Stephan
Case Number: 3:2020cv00287
Filed: March 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:2102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER directing the parties to file on or before May 26, 2020, a joint notice as to whether this case should be stayed completely in light of the Notice of Bankruptcy filed by Defendant Klausner Lumber One, LLC. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/5/2020. (AMP)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Plaintiffs' case as to Defendants Leopold Stephan and Christoph Schaetz. The Clerk is directed to terminate Leopold Stephan and Christoph Schaetz from the Court docket. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/5/2020. (AMP)
May 4, 2020 Filing 101 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by William McClain. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 100 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Wilbur Robinson. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 99 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Walter Miles. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 98 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Travis Dennis. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 97 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Tony Sesson. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 96 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Timothy Gardner. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 95 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Tillman Raymond. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 94 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Terry Jackson. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 93 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Tasha Handy. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 92 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Stacey Donaldson. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 91 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Shonte Myrick. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 90 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Shannon Kellogg. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 89 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Shaneka Harrison. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 88 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Sergio Graham. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 87 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Scott Elias. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 86 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ronnie Bridges. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 85 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ronketrick Jordan. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 84 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Rondell McGee. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 83 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Rodney Raga. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 82 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Robert Herbst. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 81 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Reuben Graham. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 80 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Philip J. Pettey, Sr. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 79 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Patrick Williams. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 78 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Patrick C. Hammack. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 77 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Patrick Brown. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 76 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Orient Livingston. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 75 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Norman Price. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 74 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Michael Whitaker. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 73 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Michael Turley. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 72 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Michael Lewis. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 71 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Michael Herrmann. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 70 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Mark Gooden. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 69 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Marcus Grant. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 68 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Liviut Zdrobau. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 67 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Levon Cherry. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 66 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Leroy Stacey. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 65 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Kristopher Chesser. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Kirby Arrington. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 63 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Kenneth A. Roberts. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 62 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Kacee Dillbeck. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 61 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Jonathan Richardson. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 60 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Johnny Fortenberry. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 59 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Johnnie Raymond. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Jimil Richardson. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 57 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by James Campbell. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 56 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Jessica Watts. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 55 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Jasper L. Hunter. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 54 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Jason Harlow. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Jared Coody. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 52 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by James Love. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by James K. Brown. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 50 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by James Allen. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Jake Latner. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Helmut Thomay. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Harmon Gervin. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Gregory Donaldson. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 45 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by George Williams. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Gary Turner. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Frederick Williams. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Edward Morgan. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Donald A. Thomas. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Dominique Williams. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Djuan Ivey. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by David Leon. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 37 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Daniel DiRoma. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 36 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Curley L. Jackson. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Cornelius Turner. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Corey Harris. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Chris Webb. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Charles Frierson. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Charles Blanton. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Charles Bernazzani. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Cecil Watterson. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Bruce Cobb. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Joseph B. Jones. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Bobby Wimbush. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Robert Davis. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Antoine Hunter. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Anthony DiRoma. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Andrea Dennis. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Alonzo Strawder. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Allen Tull. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Alicia Horne. (Lechner, Jay)
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preservation of Evidence and/or Injunctive Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit of Helmut Thomay)(Lechner, Jay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Modified docket text on 5/5/2020) (KEM).
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Kirby Arrington, Ronnie Bridges, James K. Brown, Patrick Brown, Levon Cherry, Kristopher Chesser, Jared Coody, Robert Davis, Andrea Dennis, Travis Dennis, Anthony DiRoma, Daniel DiRoma, Kacee Dillbeck, Gregory Donaldson, Stacey Donaldson, Scott Elias, Johnny Fortenberry, Timothy Gardner, Patrick C. Hammack, Shaneka Harrison, Alicia Horne, Antoine Hunter, Jasper L. Hunter, Djuan Ivey, Curley L. Jackson, Joseph B. Jones, Ronketrick Jordan, Shannon Kellogg, Jake Latner, Walter Miles, Justin Palmatier, Philip J. Pettey, Sr, Johnnie Raymond, Tillman Raymond, Jimil Richardson, Kenneth A. Roberts, Donald A. Thomas, Helmut Thomay, Allen Tull, Cornelius Turner, Jessica Watts, Chris Webb, Dominique Williams, Frederick Williams, George Williams, Patrick Williams. (Lechner, Jay)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay by Klausner Lumber One, LLC, David Larkin (Larkin, David) Modified text on 5/4/2020. (AEJ)
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Kirby Arrington, Ronnie Bridges, James K. Brown, Patrick Brown, Levon Cherry, Kristopher Chesser, Jared Coody, Robert Davis, Andrea Dennis, Travis Dennis, Anthony DiRoma, Daniel DiRoma, Kacee Dillbeck, Gregory Donaldson, Stacey Donaldson, Scott Elias, Johnny Fortenberry, Timothy Gardner, Patrick C. Hammack, Shaneka Harrison, Alicia Horne, Antoine Hunter, Jasper L. Hunter, Djuan Ivey, Curley L. Jackson, Joseph B. Jones, Ronketrick Jordan, Shannon Kellogg, Jake Latner, Walter Miles, Justin Palmatier, Philip J. Pettey, Sr, Johnnie Raymond, Tillman Raymond, Jimil Richardson, Kenneth A. Roberts, Donald A. Thomas, Helmut Thomay, Allen Tull, Cornelius Turner, Jessica Watts, Chris Webb, Dominique Williams, Frederick Williams, George Williams, Patrick Williams (Lechner, Jay)
April 24, 2020 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Klausner Holding USA, Inc. (AEJ)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Klausner Holding USA, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Lechner, Jay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Klausner Lumber Two, LLC (AEJ)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Klausner Lumber One, LLC (AEJ)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Klausner Lumber One, LLC, Klausner Lumber Two, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Lechner, Jay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 3/31/20 as to Klausner Lumber One LLC. by Johnnie Raymond (Lechner, Jay) (Modified docket text on 4/22/2020.) (KEM).
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 4/1/20 as to Klausner Holdings USA Inc. by Johnnie Raymond (Lechner, Jay) (Modified docket text on 4/22/2020.) (KEM).
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on Mar. 31, 2020 by Jared Coody, Kristopher Chesser, Shaneka Harrison, Kirby Arrington, Patrick Williams, Andrea Dennis, Johnnie Raymond, Levon Cherry, Cornelius Turner, Patrick Brown, Stacey Donaldson, George Williams, Chris Webb, Donald A. Thomas, Alicia Horne, Daniel DiRoma, Justin Palmatier, Walter Miles, Tillman Raymond, Philip J. Pettey, Sr, James K. Brown, Jasper L. Hunter, Patrick C. Hammack, Frederick Williams, Kacee Dillbeck, Shannon Kellogg, Scott Elias, Allen Tull, Anthony DiRoma, Johnny Fortenberry, Jessica Watts, Helmut Thomay, Antoine Hunter, Ronnie Bridges, Timothy Gardner, Joseph B. Jones, Jake Latner, Robert Davis, Travis Dennis, Kenneth A. Roberts, Dominique Williams, Jimil Richardson, Gregory Donaldson, Ronketrick Jordan, Djuan Ivey, Curley L. Jackson as to Klausner Lumber Two, LLC. (Lechner, Jay)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Kirby Arrington, Ronnie Bridges, James K. Brown, Patrick Brown, Levon Cherry, Kristopher Chesser, Jared Coody, Robert Davis, Andrea Dennis, Travis Dennis, Anthony DiRoma, Daniel DiRoma, Kacee Dillbeck, Gregory Donaldson, Stacey Donaldson, Scott Elias, Johnny Fortenberry, Timothy Gardner, Patrick C. Hammack, Shaneka Harrison, Alicia Horne, Antoine Hunter, Jasper L. Hunter, Djuan Ivey, Curley L. Jackson, Joseph B. Jones, Ronketrick Jordan, Shannon Kellogg, Jake Latner, Walter Miles, Justin Palmatier, Philip J. Pettey, Sr, Johnnie Raymond, Tillman Raymond, Jimil Richardson, Kenneth A. Roberts, Donald A. Thomas, Helmut Thomay, Allen Tull, Cornelius Turner, Jessica Watts, Chris Webb, Dominique Williams, Frederick Williams, George Williams, Patrick Williams. (Lechner, Jay)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 and FLSA Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lechner, Jay)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Klausner Holding USA, Inc., Klausner Lumber One, LLC, Klausner Lumber Two, LLC, Christoph Schaetz, Leopold Stephan. (AEJ)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:20-cv-287-J-39MCR. (SJB)
March 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action and Demand for Jury Trial against Klausner Holding USA, Inc., Klausner Lumber One, LLC, Klausner Lumber Two, LLC, Christoph Schaetz, Leopold Stephan with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16620568) filed by Johnnie Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Lechner, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond v. Klausner Lumber One, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christoph Schaetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klausner Lumber One, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klausner Holding USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klausner Lumber Two, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leopold Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Raymond
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levon Cherry
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Harlow
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Chesser
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Brown
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph B. Jones
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helmut Thomay
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Grant
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Graham
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Dennis
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McClain
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Sesson
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Arrington
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Frierson
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben Graham
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Gardner
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Turner
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Donaldson
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kacee Dillbeck
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allen
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Fortenberry
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Harris
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Horne
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Dennis
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel DiRoma
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Leon
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Turley
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronketrick Jordan
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper L. Hunter
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Handy
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Williams
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Herrmann
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonte Myrick
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Morgan
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony DiRoma
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Love
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Blanton
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Cobb
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Webb
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Djuan Ivey
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Richardson
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbur Robinson
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Wimbush
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Tull
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Price
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Donaldson
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip J. Pettey, Sr.
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liviut Zdrobau
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curley L. Jackson
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Herbst
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Watterson
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick C. Hammack
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A. Thomas
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Roberts
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimil Richardson
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Miles
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaneka Harrison
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Gooden
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Williams
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tillman Raymond
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Campbell
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Palmatier
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Coody
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Stacey
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James K. Brown
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Williams
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Turner
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Hunter
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harmon Gervin
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Latner
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Kellogg
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Raga
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Jackson
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Elias
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lewis
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondell McGee
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orient Livingston
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bernazzani
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Strawder
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Bridges
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Williams
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Watts
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?