Sims v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Appellant: Sha'ron A. Sims
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00302
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1(Bankruptcy Appeal). Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/24/2020. (CKS)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Sha'ron A. Sims. (Attachments: #1 3-15-bk-02731_2Notice_of_Appeal_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #2 3-15-bk-02731_3Notice_of_Filing_Appeal_Cover_Sheet_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #3 3-15-bk-02731_4Order_Dismissing_Case__This_Order_is_Effective_on_the_15th_Day_Following_Date_of_Entry, #4 3-15-bk-02731_5Order_Denying_Motion_to_Vacate_Order_Dismissing_Cae, #5 3-15-bk-02731_6Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRo, #6 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_13_Installments, #7 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000002_Statement_of_Debtors_Social_Security_Numbers_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #8 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000003_Application_to_Pay_Filing_Fee_in_Installments_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #9 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000004_Notice_of_Deficient_Filing_Summary_Schedules_Ch13_plan, #10 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000005_Notice_of_Commencement_of_Case_Section_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_and_Fixing_Deadlines__S, #11 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000006_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Meeting_of_Creditors, #12 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000007_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_to_Creditors_and_Parties_in_Interest, #13 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000008_Order_Approving_Application_To_Pay_Filing_Fees_In_Installments, #14 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000009_Amended_Notice_of_Commencement_of_Case_Section_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_and_Fixing_Deadl, #15 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000010_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Meeting_of_Creditors, #16 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000011_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #17 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000012_Summary_of_Schedules__Schedules_A_-_J_and_Summary_of_Schedules, #18 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000013_Notice_of_Deficient_Filing_Creditor_added_after_341_Meeting_Notice, #19 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000014_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #20 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000015_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_to_Creditors_and_Parties_in_Interest, #21 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000016_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #22 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000017_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Steven_H_Gaddy_on_behalf_of_Creditor, #23 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000018_Certificate_of_Service_Re_341_Notice_on_Addtitional_Creditor_-_Citibank_South_and_Amended, #24 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000019_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_Filed_by_Trustee_Douglas_W_Neway, #25 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000020_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_Filed_by_Steven_H_Gaddy_on_behalf_of_Creditor_WELLS_FARG, #26 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000021_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_for_Failure_to_File_Documents_under_Sec_521, #27 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000022_Notice_of_Claim_Filed_by_DebtorTrustee_regarding_Claim_Number_2_Filed_by_the_Debtor_on_b, #28 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000023_Amended_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A, #29 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000024_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #30 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000025_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #31 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000026_Amended_Schedule_B_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #32 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000027_Amended_Statement_of_Financial_Affairs_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #33 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000028_Motion_to_Determine_Secured_StatusValue_of_Wells_Fargo_Bank_Mortgage_and_to_Strip_Lien_E, #34 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000029_Emergency_Motion_to_Enforce_Automatic_Stay_against_Wells_Fargo_Bank_with_Certificate_of_Ne, #35 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000030_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_to_Enforce_Automatic_Stay_against_Wells, #36 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000031_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #37 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000032_Order_Striking_Amended_Schedule_B, #38 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000033_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing, #39 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000034_Response_to_Emergency_Motion_to_Enforce_Automatic_Stay_Filed_by_Stefan_Beuge_on_behalf_of, #40 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000035_Motion_to_DismissWithdraw_Document_re_Emergency_Ex-Parte_Motion_to_Enforce_Automatic_Sta, #41 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000036_Response_to_Motion_to_Determine_the_Value_of_Real_Property_Filed_by_Stefan_Beuge_on_behalf, #42 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000037_Declaration_re_Statement_of_Financial_Affairs_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #43 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000038_Motion_for_Exemption_from_Credit_Counseling_Due_to_Because_of_Emergency_Filing_and_was_not, #44 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000039_Response_to_Wells_Fargos_Response_to_Debtors_Motion_to_Determine_Value_of_Real_Property, #45 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000040_Amended_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A, #46 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000041_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #47 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000042_Schedule_B, #48 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000043_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_1-Confirmation_Hearing_2-Objection_to, #49 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000044_Order_Denying_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case, #50 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000045_Order_Striking_Amended_Schedule_B, #51 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000046_Notice_of_Continued_Hearing_on_Confirmation, #52 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000047_Proof_of_Service_of_Order_Denying_Motion_to_Dismiss_and_Determining_Debtor_is_in_Complianc, #53 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000048_Order_Denying_Motion_to_Determine_Secured_Status_of_Wells_Fargo_Bank_NA_Mortgage_and_to, #54 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000049_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #55 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000050_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #56 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000051_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #57 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000052_Notice_of_Requirement_to_File_a_Statement_of_Completion_of_Course_in_Personal_Financial_Ma, #58 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000053_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing, #59 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000054_Schedule_B_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Summary_of_Schedules__Statement_of_Fina, #60 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000055_Order_Striking_Amended_Schedule_B_Summary_of_Schedules_and_Statement_of_Affairs, #61 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000056_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #62 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000057_Notice_of_Appeal_Filing_Fee_Paid_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #63 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000058_Motion_for_Leave_to_Appeal_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #64 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000059_Notice_of_Deficient_Filing_Appeal_Cover_Sheet_and_Motion_for_Leave_to_Appeal_Fee_of_500, #65 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000060_Part_1_Service_of_Previously_Entered_OrderNotice_via_Bankruptcy_Noticing_Center_Title_of_Previo, #66 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000060_Part_2_Motion, #67 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000061_Summary_of_Schedules__Schedule_B_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Statement_of_Fina, #68 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000062_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Appeal, #69 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000063_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing, #70 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000064_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #71 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000065_Notice_of_Filing_Appeal_Cover_Sheet, #72 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000066_Transmittal_of_Motion_for_Leave_to_Appeal_to_District_Court_Case_No_3-15-cv-1190-J-25, #73 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000067_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #74 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000068_Objection_to_Claim, #75 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000069_Certificate_of_Debtor_Education_Concerning_Personal_Financial_Management_Received_from_Age, #76 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000070_Certificate_Regarding_Domestic_Support_Obligation_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #77 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000071_Order_Sustaining_Objection_to_Claim, #78 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000072_Proof_of_Service_of_ORDER_SUSTAINING_TRUSTEE27S_OBJECTION_TO_CLAIM_2_OF_WELLS_FARGO_HOME, #79 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000073_Second_Amended_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor_Sha, #80 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000074_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_1-CONTINUED_Confirmation_Hearing_2-Ob, #81 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000075_Notice_of_Continued_Hearing_on_Confirmation, #82 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000076_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #83 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000077_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #84 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000078_Amended_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_Filed_by_Stefan_Noah_Beuge_on_behalf_of_Creditor, #85 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000079_Order_entered_on_December_30_2015_by_District_Court_Judge_Judge_Henry_Lee_Adams_Jr_Re, #86 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000080_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_1-CONTINUED_Confirmation_Hearing_2-Ob, #87 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000081_Motion_to_ContinueReschedule_Hearing_On_Confirmation, #88 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000082_Order_Continuing_Confirmation_Hearing, #89 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000083_Proof_of_Service_of_ORDER_CONTINUING_CONFIRMATION_HEARING_Filed_by_Trustee_Douglas_W_New, #90 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000084_Affidavit_of_non_receipt_of_response_Filed_by_Debtor_ShaRon_A_Sims, #91 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000085_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_1-CONTINUED_Confirmation_Hearing_2-Ob, #92 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000086_Notice_of_Continued_Confirmation_Hearing__Hearing_scheduled_for_6142016_at_0930_AM_at, #93 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000087_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #94 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000088_Fourth_Amended_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor_Sha, #95 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000089_Notice_of_Filing_Fraudelent_Action_Suite_against_Wells_Fargo_Bank_NA_for_Breach_of_Contr, #96 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000090_Order_entered_on_42016_by_Judge_Judges_Tjoflat_Rosenbaum_and_Jill_Pryor_Re_Appeal_on, #97 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000091_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_1-CONTINUED_Confirmation_Hearing_2-Ob, #98 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000092_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_on_Confirmation_of_Chapter_13_Plan, #99 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000093_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #100 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000094_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #101 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000095_Fifth_Amended_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor_Sha, #102 3-15-bk-02731_Docket_000096_Amended_Schedule_AB_Filing
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Sha'ron A. Sims. (AFC)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 3/24/20. (SJW)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Sha'ron A. Sims. Bankruptcy Court case number 3:15-bk-2731. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 3/6/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal, #2 Order, #3 Bk Civil cover sheet)(SJW) (Modified on 3/25/2020 as to filed date)(SJW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sha'ron A. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Noah S. Beuge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?