Byzantine, Inc. v. Properties by Patricia, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BYZANTINE, INC.
Defendant: PROPERTIES BY PATRICIA, LLC and COREY A. HASTING
Case Number: 3:2020cv00350
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE to counsel Kerri C. Sturm of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AEJ)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 PROPERTIES BY PATRICIA, LLC'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Properties by Patricia, LLC.(Anderson, Geddes)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Byzantine, Inc.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cause of Action and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Corey A. Hasting. (Ray, Thomas) (Modified docket text on 5/12/2020) (KEM).
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Byzantine, Inc.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Defendant, Corey A. Hasting's, Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant Corey A. Hasting shall have up to and including May 11, 2020 to respond to #1 the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 5/1/2020. (RLS)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Corey A. Hasting. (Ray, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Robert Ray on behalf of Corey A. Hasting (Ray, Thomas)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Corey A. Hasting. (Ray, Thomas)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of service by Byzantine, Inc. re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice . (Barauskas, Aleksas)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Corey A. Hasting, Properties by Patricia, LLC. (AEJ)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-350-J-39JBT. (SJB)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COREY A. HASTING, PROPERTIES BY PATRICIA, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16673845) filed by BYZANTINE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revolving Line of Credit Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Partial Release of Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Consent Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Consent to Disbursement of Esrow Funds by Properties by Patricia, #6 Exhibit F - Consent to Disbursement of Escrow Funds by Panagiota A. Hasting, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons PROPERTIES BY PATRICIA, LLC, #9 Proposed Summons COREY A. HASTING)(Barauskas, Aleksas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byzantine, Inc. v. Properties by Patricia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROPERTIES BY PATRICIA, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Giurato
Represented By: Geddes Dowling Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COREY A. HASTING
Represented By: Thomas Robert Ray
Represented By: Bethany Ray Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BYZANTINE, INC.
Represented By: Aleksas A Barauskas
Represented By: Jacob Aaron Brown
Represented By: Kerri C. Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?