Woodard v. Perez-Lugo et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Woodard
Defendant: E. Perez-Lugo, Dr. Frank Papillion, CPL. Roberts and M. Corrales
Case Number: 3:2020cv00613
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/22/2020. (CKS)
June 17, 2020 Filing 21 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-00613-J-39JRK. (KEM) (Modified docket text on 6/17/2020) (KEM).
June 17, 2020 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00152. File received electronically
June 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION.The magistrate judge's report and recommendation (ECF No. #12) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order of the court. The clerk shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 6/12/2020. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #12 (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #17 Letter Requesting Forms (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Plaintiff's recent letter, ECF No. #17, is construed as Plaintiff's objections and shall be referred to the presiding District Judge to consider when ruling on the pending Report and Recommendation, ECF No. #12. No forms need be sent to Plaintiff and nothing further shall be filed in this case if the document is not properly signed by Plaintiff. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/26/2020. (rcb) Modified to edit filing date on 5/29/2020 (rcb). [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 26, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #17 Letter Requesting Forms (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 Letter Requesting Forms from MELVIN WOODARD (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #16 Order. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. No further action will be taken on Plaintiffs letter, ECF No. #15, as it is not properly signed by Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court shall refer the pending Report and Recommendation, ECF No. #12, to the presiding District Judge. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/20/2020. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 18, 2020 ACTION IS NO LONGER REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is no longer needed Re: Action Required by District Judge Re: #14 Order on Report and Recommendation. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 6/4/2020. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 18, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #15 Letter. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from MELVIN WOODARD (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 12, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #14 Order on Report and Recommendation, (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Plaintiff's notice, ECF No. #13, has been reviewed and evaluated. Construed as a motion for appointment of counsel, ECF No. #13, the motion is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall refer this case to the presiding District Judge for consideration in due course of the pending Report and Recommendation, ECF No. #12. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/12/2020. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 11, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #13 Notice of Compliance Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Compliance by MELVIN WOODARD (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #11 Second Amended Complaint. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION- R&R flag set. In light of the foregoing, and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and 1406(a), the undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings, including a merits review of the first amended complaint, ECF No. #9. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/7/2020. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier 6/4/2020. (rcb) Modified to reopen R & R on 5/18/2020 (rcb). [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against E PEREZ-LUGO, filed by MELVIN WOODARD. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 6, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #10 Letter. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from MELVIN WOODARD (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
April 23, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #9 First Amended Complaint. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against E PEREZ-LUGO, filed by MELVIN WOODARD. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers on 5/22/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2020. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Plaintiff's letter, ECF No. #7, is construed as a motion for an extension of time and is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with another 1983 complaint form so Plaintiff can file the amended complaint as directed. Plaintiff has until May 22, 2020, to file an amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written, submitted on court forms, and containing Plaintiff's original signature and complete signature block. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint, or no later than May 22, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/21/2020. (rcb)** 1983 Complaint Form forwarded as directed** [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
April 15, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 Letter Construed as a Motion Requesting Next Procedure Assistance by MELVIN WOODARD. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/3/2020. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:20cv152-WS/MAF. (amm) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with another 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file an amended complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 4/28/2020, to file an amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written, submitted on court forms, and which contains Plaintiffs original signature. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint, or no later than 4/28/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/26/2020. (rcb)** 1983 Complaint Form Forwarded As Directed** [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2, is GRANTED to the extent the filing fee does not have to be prepaid. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order with appropriate cover letter, to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/26/2020. (rcb) **Copy of this order forwarded to DOC/OGC @ 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500**. [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
March 25, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by MELVIN WOODARD. (rcb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/27/2020) (rcb). [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MELVIN WOODARD. (rcb)**No Service Copy Received** (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/27/2020) (rcb). [Transferred from flnd on 6/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. Perez-Lugo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Perez-Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Frank Papillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPL. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Corrales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?