Hewerdine v. Eli Lilly and Company
Plaintiff: Justine Hewerdine
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00659
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for One-Week Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including 8/27/2020 to respond to the Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (Doc. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/21/2020. (MDC)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel Ellen Boshoff, Amanda Shelby and Adriana Figueroa of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGR)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Second Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company. (Alrutz, Laura) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Modified on 8/21/2020 edit to text) (BGR).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; Defendant shall have up to and including 8/20/2020 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/20/2020. (BHC)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company. (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Siler-Nixon on behalf of Eli Lilly and Company (Siler-Nixon, Dawn)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
June 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Eli Lilly and Company. (PAM)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-659-J-34JRK. (SJB)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eli Lilly and Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16989571) filed by Justine Hewerdine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Schmitz, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewerdine v. Eli Lilly and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Hewerdine
Represented By: Gregory R. Schmitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Dawn Siler-Nixon
Represented By: Ellen E. Boshoff
Represented By: Adriana Figueroa
Represented By: Amanda L. Shelby
Represented By: Laura Alrutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?