Turner v. Deutsche Bank
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Defendant: Deutsche Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv00674
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Default Judgment against Deutsche Bank filed by Deutsche Bank. (White, B.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Default Judgment against Deutsche Bank by Terrance Turner. (AEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
July 23, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Deutsche Bank. (White, B.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank re #25 Case Management Report, #28 Case Management Report (White, B.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (KEM)
July 20, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Related case order and track 2 notice by Terrance Turner. (KEM)
July 20, 2020 Filing 26 Proposed Unilateral CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Terrance Turner. (KEM)
July 20, 2020 Filing 25 Unilateral CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (KEM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Terrance Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit M)(AEJ)
July 10, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Deutsche Bank. (White, B.)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER advising pro se Plaintiff of some procedural rules with which he must comply. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 7/8/2020. (RLS)
July 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Form)(CKS)
June 30, 2020 Filing 20 TRANSFER IN from the Middle District of Georgia. Case assigned to District Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-00674-BJD-JBT. (AEJ)
June 30, 2020 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:20-cv-00068. File received electronically
June 30, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Middle District of Florida. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 7/14/2020.) (ggs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 6/29/2020. (chc) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by TERRANCE TURNER re #16 Order to Show Cause (ggs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within 10 days why this action should not be dismissed or transferred for lack of venue. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 6/24/20. (rlh) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 15 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Surreply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 5/13/2020 (TES) Modified on 5/14/2020 to link documents. (ggs). [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by TERRANCE TURNER.(ggs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 SURREPLY filed by TERRANCE TURNER re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint. NOTE: Pro se Plaintiff has not obtained permission to file a surreply, case manager referred him to the Local Rules, a motion for leave to file a surreply should be forthcoming. (ggs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY filed by DEUTSCHE BANK to #11 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Decisions)(CHURCH, KELLI) Modified on 5/12/2020 to correct event type and related filing(deb). [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by TERRANCE TURNER re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint. NOTE: Document is entitled motion for hearing, but is also being construed as a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The motion for hearing has been denied pursuant to text only order at Tab 10. (ggs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #9 Motion for Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 4/27/2020 (TES) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Hearing re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, Filed by TERRANCE TURNER.(ggs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2020: #1 Amended motion (amended to affix electronic signature)) (ggs). [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Motion for Hearing filed by TERRANCE TURNER ); Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, every pleading, written motion and other papers must be signed by a party personally if the party is unrepresented. You must refile your signed document within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal of your case by the Court. (ggs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEUTSCHE BANK identifying Corporate Parent DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST CORPORATION, Other Affiliate DEUTSCHE BANK AG, Other Affiliate DB USA CORPORATION for DEUTSCHE BANK. (CHURCH, KELLI) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by DEUTSCHE BANK filed by KELLI N CHURCH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint Served on Defendant, #2 Exhibit B Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit C Intake Questionnaire, #4 Exhibit D Unpublished Decisions)(CHURCH, KELLI) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEUTSCHE BANK (CHURCH, KELLI) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TERMINATED - REFILED AT TAB 7 PURSUANT TO DEFICIENCY NOTICE. MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by DEUTSCHE BANK filed by KELLI N CHURCH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(CHURCH, KELLI) Modified on 4/27/2020 (ggs). [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by DEUTSCHE BANK Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3450051, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: 751414. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(WHITE, BILL) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DEUTSCHE BANK ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. Adding corporate parents and subsidiary corporations ("other affiliates") is accomplished during the docketing process by responding "yes" to the question asking if there are any corporate parents, etc. You are then prompted to add them. (ggs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by DEUTSCHE BANK ); Generic descriptions of exhibits (i.e. Exhibit A) are not permitted. Document must be re-filed to include a description of exhibit(s). (ggs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TERRANCE TURNER as to DEUTSCHE BANK. (ggs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to TERRANCE TURNER (vs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEUTSCHE BANK Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number GAM500034816,filed by TERRANCE TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Dismissal and notice of rights, #3 Letter to the executives- Deutsche Bank, #4 EEOC lawyer brief, #5 Complaint for employment discrimination)(vs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]
February 19, 2020 REMARK: Mailed Summons and forms for serving a complaint under rule 4 (vs) [Transferred from gamd on 6/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Deutsche Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank
Represented By: Bill Tyler White
Represented By: Kelli N. Church
Represented By: B. Tyler White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?