Stewart v. Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.
Plaintiff: Randall Stewart
Defendant: Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00796
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (RH)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/15/2021. Dispositive motions due by 4/30/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A., Corporate Parent Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc., Other Affiliate Randall Stewart, Other Affiliate Sami R. Achem, Jr., Esq., Other Affiliate Victoria M. Merritt for Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc... (Achem, Sami)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wulbern, Shands)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Randall Stewart. (Wulbern, Shands)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Achem, Sami)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Randall Stewart. (Wulbern, Shands)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Defendant's Unopposed and Agreed Upon Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendant filing a proper federal court motion, if appropriate, in accordance with all applicable rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 7/22/2020. (RLS)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend #4 Answer to Complaint by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RH)(originally filed in State Court) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 7/21/2020 (RH).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (originally filed in State Court) (RH)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Randall Stewart. (originally filed in State Court)(RH)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-796-J-34JBT. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cicuit Court of The Fourth Judicial Circuit In and For Duval County, Florida, case number 3:20-CA-00796 filed in State Court on 7/16/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17070978 filed by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Achem, Sami)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Sami Achem
Represented By: Victoria Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Stewart
Represented By: Shands M. Wulbern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?