Express Mobile, Inc. v. Web.com Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Defendant: Web.com Group, Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00839
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:01
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 47 TRANSFER IN from the District of Delaware. Case assigned to District Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-839-J-39JBT. (KEM)
July 28, 2020 Filing 46 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01936. File received electronically
July 28, 2020 Case transferred to the United Stated District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Defendant's motion to transfer this case (D.I. #15) is GRANTED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/14/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/14/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-74) and Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-17) filed by Web.com Group, Inc..(Day, John)[Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Express Mobile, Inc.'s Responses to Defendant Web.com's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-70); and (2) Express Mobile, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) filed by Express Mobile, Inc..(Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (30 in 19-cv-1937-RGA; 41 in 19-cv-1936-RGA) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time regarding initial claim chart and invalidity contentions. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01936-RGA, 1:19-cv-01937-RGA(nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 6/3/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notices of Subpoena filed by Web.com Group, Inc..(Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Web.com's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) to Plaintiff Express Mobile, Inc. and Defendant Web.com's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-70) to Plaintiff Express Mobile, Inc. filed by Web.com Group, Inc..(Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Core Technical Document Production Pursuant to the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Web.com Group, Inc..(Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Michael Dockterman,R obert F. Kappers, Tron Y. Fu for Express Mobile, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Dockterman, Robert F. Kappers and Tron Y. Fu, filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/15/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Dockterman, Robert F. Kappers and Tron Y. Fu - filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Express Mobile, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Web.com Group, Inc. (Nos. 1-17); and (2) Express Mobile, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production to Web.com Group, Inc. (Nos. 1-74) filed by Express Mobile, Inc..(Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Express Mobile, Inc.'s ESI Default Standard Paragraph 3 and 4(a) Disclosures; and (2) Plaintiff Express Mobile, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Express Mobile, Inc..(Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Web.com's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery and Defendant Web.com Group, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Web.com Group, Inc..(Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Express Mobile, Inc.'s Identification of Accused Products and Asserted Patents filed by Express Mobile, Inc..(Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SO ORDERED as Amended re (30 in 19-cv-1936-RGA; 19 in 19-cv-1937-RGA) Proposed Order Regarding Disclosure of Patent License and Settlement Agreements. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/6/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01936-RGA, 1:19-cv-01937-RGA(nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SO ORDERED Granting (18 in 19-cv-1937-RGA; 29 in 19-cv-1936-RGA) Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/6/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01936-RGA, 1:19-cv-01937-RGA(nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 30 PROPOSED Order regarding Disclosure of Patent License and Settlement Agreements, by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 3/6/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 29 PROPOSED Protective Order, by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 3/6/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 28 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 2/18/20 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather M. Triozzi,Email: Heather_Triozzi@ded,uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2020. (Triozzi, Heather) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 27 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Express Mobile, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (16 in 19-cv-1937-RGA; 26 in 19-cv-1936-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a Proposed Protective Order and Stipulation Regarding and Disclosure of Licenses and Agreements to March 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/2/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01936-RGA, 1:19-cv-01937-RGA(nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a Proposed Protective Order and Stipulation Regarding and Disclosure of Licenses and Agreements to March 5, 2020 - filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 3/2/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel Mahfood for Web.com Group, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Mahfood, filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/26/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Mahfood - filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. (Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 23 EXHIBITS re #22 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 2C, #6 Exhibit 2D, #7 Exhibit 2E, #8 Exhibit 2F, #9 Exhibit 2G, #10 Exhibit 2H, #11 Exhibit 2I, #12 Exhibit 2J, #13 Exhibit 2K, #14 Exhibit 2L, #15 Exhibit 2M, #16 Exhibit 2N, #17 Exhibit 2O, #18 Exhibit 2P)(Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 2/20/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 20, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits filed at D.I. 23 have been removed from the docket as the filing lacked a captioned titled cover page. Counsel shall refile the exhibits accordingly. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Express Mobile, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/26/2020. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 21 ORAL ORDER: This matter has been referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for ADR. Counsel are to advise on or before March 10, 2020 by a JOINT EMAIL to Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Ms. Kennedy, their clients interest in mediation and the timing when mediation is preferred with a very brief explanation why. When referencing the time for mediation, counsel rely on certain events in the scheduling order, for example, before claim construction briefing, after the close of discovery, before expert report and the like, they are to include the date(s) on when such event(s) occur. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/18/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01936-RGA, 1:19-cv-01937-RGA(cak) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 18, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01936-RGA, 1:19-cv-01937-RGA(cak) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for discovery disputes. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. Fact Discovery completed by 5/26/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2021. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 3/19/2021. A Markman Hearing is set for 4/8/2021, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. The first Pretrial Conference is set for 2/18/2022, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. The first Jury Trial is set for 3/7/2022, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01936-RGA, 1:19-cv-01937-RGA(nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 2/18/2020. Local counsel present for plaintiff: T. Devlin. Local counsel present for defendants: B. Moskow-Schnoll, J. Day. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01936-RGA, 1:19-cv-01937-RGA(crb) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 2/14/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Siris Capital Group, LLC for Web.com Group, Inc. filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. (Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Oppose Motion to Transfer to February 19, 2020 (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue. Answering Brief due 2/19/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/30/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Transfer to February 19, 2020 - filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue, filed by Web.com Group, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 1/23/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Venue - filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 1/23/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/18/2020, at 9:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/17/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Katherine H. Johnson for Express Mobile, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine H. Johnson, filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/16/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine H. Johnson - filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Allison M. Lucier for Web.com Group, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jacob W.S. Schneider,Frederick D. Page for Web.com Group, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura B. Renstrom for Web.com Group, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allison M. Lucier, filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allison M. Lucier - filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. (Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frederick D. Page, Jacob W.S. Schneider, and Laura B. Renstrom, filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frederick D. Page, Jacob W.S. Schneider, and Laura B. Renstrom - filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. (Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Web.com Group, Inc..(Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher A. Suarez for Express Mobile, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James R. Nuttall for Express Mobile, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James R. Nuttall and Christopher Suarez, filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James R. Nuttall and Christopher Suarez - filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to January 13, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Web.com Group, Inc. answer due 1/13/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/5/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to January 13, 2020 - filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. (Day, John) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Timothy Devlin, regarding status report. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 11/26/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Web.com Group, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Web.com Group, Inc.. (lak) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER: Defendant's answer was due to be filed on 11/12/2019 (see D.I. #4), and to date none has been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/20/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Web.com Group, Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01936-RGA, 1:19-cv-01937-RGA (rjb) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Web.com Group, Inc. on 10/15/2019. (nmg) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
October 15, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 6,546,397 ;U.S. 7,594,168 ;U.S. 9,063,755 ;U.S. 9,471,287 ;U.S. 9,928,044. (lak) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Web.com Group, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2753633.) - filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) [Transferred from ded on 7/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Mobile, Inc. v. Web.com Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. Kappers
Represented By: Christopher A. Suarez
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Katherine H. Johnson
Represented By: Tron Y Fu
Represented By: James R. Nuttall
Represented By: Michael Dockterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Web.com Group, Inc
Represented By: Frederick D. Page
Represented By: Daniel Mahfood
Represented By: Allison M. Lucier
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Jacob W.S. Schneider
Represented By: Laura B. Renstrom
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?