E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., et al v. McEachern et al
Plaintiff: Pablo Creek Services, Inc., E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., d/b/a American Heritage Insurance Services and E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. doing business as American Heritage Insurance Services
Defendant: John Nelson Patrick McEachern and Blue Dealer Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00847
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Amended Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice & Certificate of Compliance. Dione C. Greene is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants with William M. Kent as local counsel. Mr. Greene shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if he has not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 9/22/2020. (MDC)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Hearing scheduled for September 3, 2020 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/1/2020. (AMP)
September 1, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by John Nelson Patrick McEachern. (Kent, William)
August 31, 2020 Filing 29 Amended MOTION for Dione Greene to appear pro hac vice by all Defendants (Kent, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified text on 9/1/2020. (AEJ)
August 31, 2020 Filing 28 Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice by John Nelson Patrick McEachern. (Kent, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
August 31, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. (Carey, Brett)
August 28, 2020 Filing 30 Written designation and consent to act by Dione C. Greene on behalf of Blue Dealer Services, Inc., John Nelson Patrick McEachern. Local Counsel: William M. Kent. Non-Resident Counsel: Dione C. Greene. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Act)(SJW)
August 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Dione Greene, appearing on behalf of Blue Dealer Services, Inc., John Nelson Patrick McEachern (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX033554.). (KEM)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER taking under advisement #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. On or before 9/1/2020, Defendants shall file a certificate of compliance with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/25/2020. (MDC)
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE to counsel Dione C. Greene of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AEJ)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING regarding #9 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing set for Thursday, September 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned in Courtroom 12C. See Notice for details. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 08/21/2020. (CKS)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Dione C. Greene to appear pro hac vice by Blue Dealer Services, Inc., John Nelson Patrick McEachern. (BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc. re #15 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining OrderOrder on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Carey, Brett)
August 21, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Lisa Schlegel)(Carey, Brett)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Blue Dealer Services, Inc. to Court Regarding Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Kent, William)
August 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by John Nelson Patrick McEachern to Court Regarding Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Kent, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Blue Dealer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kent, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Nelson Patrick McEachern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kent, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by All Defendants. (Kent, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; taking under advisement #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 9) on September 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/12/2020. (MCW)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance as Local Counsel - Corrected Appearance by William Mallory Kent on behalf of Blue Dealer Services, Inc. (Kent, William)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance as Local Counsel - Corrected Appearance by William Mallory Kent on behalf of John Nelson Patrick McEachern (Kent, William)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance as Local Counsel Appearance by William Mallory Kent on behalf of Blue Dealer Services, Inc. (Kent, William)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance as Local Counsel Appearance by William Mallory Kent on behalf of John Nelson Patrick McEachern (Kent, William)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in support re #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. (Carey, Brett)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. (Carey, Brett)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Lisa Schlegel re: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc. (Carey, Brett) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (AEJ)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carey, Brett)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 08/03/2020 as to John Nelson Patrick McEachern by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc. (Carey, Brett) Modified text on 8/10/2020. (AEJ)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 08/03/2020 as to Blue Dealer Services, Inc. by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc. (Carey, Brett) Modified text on 8/10/2020. (AEJ)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Blue Dealer Services, Inc., John Nelson Patrick McEachern. (AEJ)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-847-J-39JRK. (SJB)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17117782) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agent Agreement (ERJ), #2 Exhibit 2 - Agent Agreement (Pablo Creek), #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand for Arbitration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Operating Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Blue Dealer Dissolution, #6 Exhibit 6 - Michigan Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - Agreement between Sellers and McEachern, #8 Exhibit 8 - Michigan Counterclaim, #9 Exhibit 9 - Response to Arbitration Demand, #10 Exhibit 10 - Letter Selecting Arbitrator, #11 Exhibit 11 - Letter from Barnes to DeVault re Third Arbitrator, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons to Blue Dealer Services, Inc., #14 Proposed Summons to McEachern)(Carey, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., et al v. McEachern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Creek Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Carey
Represented By: Lena Marguerite Mirilovic
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., d/b/a American Heritage Insurance Services
Represented By: Brett Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. doing business as American Heritage Insurance Services
Represented By: Lena Marguerite Mirilovic
Represented By: Brett Carey
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nelson Patrick McEachern
Represented By: Dione C. Greene
Represented By: William Mallory Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Dealer Services, Inc.
Represented By: Dione C. Greene
Represented By: William Mallory Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?