McLeaird v. Allergan Sales, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ariel Lynn McLeaird
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC and Ricardo E Mojica
Case Number: 3:2020cv00851
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Allergan Sales, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allergan, Inc., Corporate Parent AbbVie, Inc., Corporate Parent Allergan Limited for Allergan Sales, LLC.. (Guthrie, Brian)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/17/2020. (JW)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by Ariel Lynn McLeaird. (Shakib, Christopher)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Guthrie, Brian)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Allergan Sales, LLC, Ricardo E Mojica filed by Ariel Lynn McLeaird. (originally filed in State Court)(RH)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Actions from In The Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit In and for Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2020-CA-003410 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17121859 filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Guthrie, Brian) Modified on 7/31/2020 to edit text (RH).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:20-cv-851-J-34MCR. (SJB)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from In The Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit in and for Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2020-CA-003410 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17121859 filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Guthrie, Brian) (MODIFIED on 7/30/2020 as to incorrect PDF'S attached; counsel notified to refile documents)(SJW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLeaird v. Allergan Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Brian T. Guthrie
Represented By: Jennifer M. Voss
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo E Mojica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Lynn McLeaird
Represented By: Christopher Shakib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?