Singh v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Gurpreet Michael Singh
Respondent: William Barr and John Kelly
Case Number: 3:2020cv00899
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing service of process; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/11/2020. (CAW)
September 9, 2020 FEES paid by Gurpreet Michael Singh (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number JAX033649) (LAB)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Petitioner to pay the filing fee or file an affidavit of indigency by 9/11/2020; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/24/2020. (CAW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/21/2020. (MD)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Richardson. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-899-J-32MCR. (MAA)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00345. File received electronically
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The magistrate judge's report and recommendation (ECF No. 4) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order of the court. The clerk shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 8/12/2020. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
August 12, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed re: #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The deadline to file Objections to the R&R has expired. No Objections have been filed. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus, ECF No. #1, filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241 be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings, and the Clerk of Court be directed to CLOSE this case. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 7/10/2020. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/7/2020. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
July 8, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by GURPREET MICHAEL SINGH. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by GURPREET MICHAEL SINGH. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurpreet Michael Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?