Millette v. Gamble et al
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Millette
Defendant: Officer Gamble and Sgt. Kitchen
Case Number: 3:2020cv00924
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order, entered August 25, 2020, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/26/2020. (RH)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/25/2020. (BL)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Reynaldo Millette. (KEM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Officer Gamble, Sgt. Kitchen filed by Reynaldo Millette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Mailing Envelope)(KEM)(No service copies provided, no payment received.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millette v. Gamble et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Millette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?