Fluker v. Inch
Petitioner: Wayne Fluker
Respondent: Florida Attorney General and Secretary, Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2020cv00929
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Petitioner's request to accept his Petition as timely filed; granting #9 Petitioner's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/25/2020. (CAW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/19/2020. (CKS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-00929-BJD-JRK. (AEJ)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00177. File received electronically
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Interdistrict Transfer to the Middle District of Florida Jacksonville Division located at 300 North Hogan Street Jacksonville, Florida 32202 (tss) [Transferred from flnd on 8/18/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/13/20. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close the file. (tss) [Transferred from flnd on 8/18/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: WAYNE FLUKER 149713, HARDEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 6901 STATE ROAD 62, BOWLING GREEN, FL 33834. (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 8/18/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (tss) [Transferred from flnd on 8/18/2020.]
August 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (no filing fee or copies received) and #2 MOTION to Accept as Timely - Referred to GARY R JONES. (tss) [Transferred from flnd on 8/18/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed by Wayne Fluker. (AEJ)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Wayne Fluker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Trust Account Statement)(AEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Accept as Timely re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WAYNE FLUKER. (tss) [Transferred from flnd on 8/18/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Wayne Fluker. (tss) [Transferred from flnd on 8/18/2020.] Modified text on 8/18/2020. (AEJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Mailing Envelope) (AEJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fluker v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florida Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wayne Fluker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?