North Pointe Insurance Company v. Pollock Logging, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: North Pointe Insurance Company as successor in interest to Capital City Insurance Company and North Pointe Insurance Company
Defendant: Pollock Logging, Inc., Randall Manning and Ray Pollock
Case Number: 3:2020cv00931
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ray Pollock, Pollock Logging, Inc.. (Dempsey, Donald)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by North Pointe Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Praetorian Insurance Company, Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group Limited (Australia), Other Affiliate North Pointe Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP, Other Affiliate QBE Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Pollock Logging, Inc., Other Affiliate Ray Pollock, Other Affiliate Rory Eric Jurman, Esq., Other Affiliate Jenelle E. La Chuisa, Esq., Other Affiliate Donald L. Dempsey, II, Esq., Other Affiliate Wade M. Rolle, Esq., Other Affiliate Randall Manning, Other Affiliate M. Brad Gibson, Esq. for North Pointe Insurance Company.. (Jurman, Rory)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Randall Manning. (Gibson, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (KKH). PDF removed and re-uploaded to extract exhibits from main document on 10/13/2020 (KKH).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 and #14 Unopposed Motions for Enlargement of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Defendants Pollock Logging, Inc. and Ray Pollock. Defendants Pollock Logging, Inc. and Ray Pollock shall have up to and including 10/15/2020 to respond to the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Doc. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 9/22/2020. (MDC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ray Pollock. (Dempsey, Donald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Pollock Logging, Inc.. (Dempsey, Donald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of service, as to Ray Pollock, executed on 8/26/2020 by North Pointe Insurance Company (Jurman, Rory) Modified to edit text on 9/21/2020 (KKH).
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service, as to Pollock Logging, Inc., executed on 8/27/2020 by North Pointe Insurance Company. (Jurman, Rory) Modified to edit text on 9/21/2020 (KKH).
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald L. Dempsey, II on behalf of Ray Pollock (Dempsey, Donald)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald L. Dempsey, II on behalf of Pollock Logging, Inc. (Dempsey, Donald)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Randall Manning, Ray Pollock, Pollock Logging, Inc.. (KKH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by North Pointe Insurance Company re #1 Complaint of Filing Corrected Exhibits to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jurman, Rory)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-931-J-32JRK. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against Randall Manning, Ray Pollock, Pollock Logging, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17193691) filed by North Pointe Insurance Company as successor in interest to Capital City Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Civil Cover Sheet, #22 Proposed Summons, #23 Proposed Summons, #24 Proposed Summons)(Jurman, Rory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Pointe Insurance Company v. Pollock Logging, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pollock Logging, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Dempsey, II
Represented By: Wade Martin Rolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Manning
Represented By: Michael Brad Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Pollock
Represented By: Donald L. Dempsey, II
Represented By: Wade Martin Rolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Pointe Insurance Company as successor in interest to Capital City Insurance Company
Represented By: Rory Eric Jurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Pointe Insurance Company
Represented By: Rory Eric Jurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?