St. Fort et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Franchesica St. Fort, Francine St. Fort, Shantoryonna Evans, F. S. and S. E.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00936
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (AEJ)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Francine St. Fort with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons USA, #3 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #4 Proposed Summons Arocho, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rotstein, Jonathan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:20-cv-936-J-39MCR. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17200411) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet, # 3 Proposed Summons Arocho, # 4 Proposed Summons Attorney General, # 5 Proposed Summons US District Attorney)(Rotstein, Jonathan) Modified on 8/20/2020 - PDFs removed, counsel notified to refile redacted complaint and exhibits. (AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Fort et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franchesica St. Fort
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine St. Fort
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantoryonna Evans
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. S.
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. E.
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?