Waite v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Crystal Donna Waite
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00937
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part, #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. This case is remanded. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transmit a certified copy of this Order to the clerk of the state court and close this file. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/9/2020. (JW)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: MOTION HEARING via videoconference held on 10/8/2020. Court Reporter: Shelli Kozachenko (JW)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hassell, F.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Crystal Donna Waite. Related case(s): yes (Alaimo, Maria)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Crystal Donna Waite. (Alaimo, Maria)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING on #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. The hearing will be held via Zoom. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will separately send participants the Zoom information. (JW)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Hassell, F.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by JetBlue Airways Corporation. Related case(s): yes (Hassell, F.)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Hassell, F.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of compliance re #5 Order pdf by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lesleigh Hopkins, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit F. Bradley Hassell)(Hassell, F.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Crystal Donna Waite. (Alaimo, Maria)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: JetBlue shall have up to and including September 4, 2020, to provide the Court with sufficient information so that it can determine whether it has jurisdiction over this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/21/2020. (MAM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Originally filed in State Court on 8/19/2020).(BGR)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against JetBlue Airways Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Crystal Donna Waite. (Originally filed in State Court on 7/23/2020).(BGR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-937-J-34JBT. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 16-2020-CA-004097 filed in State Court on 07/23/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17200673 filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hassell, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waite v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Donna Waite
Represented By: Maria Alaimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: F. Bradley Hassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?