Edgerton et al v. City of St. Augustine Beach, Florida
Plaintiff: William McRae, H K Edgerton, Jill Pacetti and William Mayhem The Pirate Magician of St Augustine
Defendant: City of St. Augustine Beach, Florida and City of St. Augustine
Case Number: 3:2020cv00941
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply filed by City of St. Augustine. (Erdelyi, Susan)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot and without prejudice #14 the defendant's motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint for failure to respond by the requested date and failure to provide an update under Local Rule 3.01(g). See Local Rule 3.01(g) ("A certification to the effect that opposing counsel was unavailable for a conference before filing a motion is insufficient to satisfy the parties' obligation to confer. The moving party retains the duty to contact opposing counsel expeditiously after filing and to supplement the motion promptly with a statement certifying whether or to what extent the parties have resolved the issue(s) presented in the motion.") Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/5/2020. (KNR)
October 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of St. Augustine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6.22.20 Minutes City Commission, #2 Exhibit City Manager 8.5.20 memo, #3 Exhibit 8.10.20 Minutes City Commission)(Erdelyi, Susan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint by City of St. Augustine Beach, Florida. (Erdelyi, Susan)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #11 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/22/2020. (AMP)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (McCallister, David)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of St. Augustine Beach, Florida filed by All Plaintiffs.(McCallister, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 3:20-cv-941-J-39PDB. Judge Marcia Morales Howard no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Brian J. Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/21/2020. (JW)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Brian J Davis on 8/20/2020. (MCW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to City of St. Augustine Beach, Florida. (SJW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel David Rhodes McCallister of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SJW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-941-J-34PDB. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued and civil cover sheet by H K Edgerton, William McRae, Jill Pacetti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCallister, David) (Modified on 8/20/2020 to edit text) (SJW).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 First Emergency Exparte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCallister, David) (Modified on 8/20/2020 to edit text and security settings to exparte) (SJW).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201950) filed by All Plaintiffs.(McCallister, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgerton et al v. City of St. Augustine Beach, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McRae
Represented By: David Rhodes McCallister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H K Edgerton
Represented By: David Rhodes McCallister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Pacetti
Represented By: David Rhodes McCallister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mayhem The Pirate Magician of St Augustine
Represented By: David Rhodes McCallister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Augustine Beach, Florida
Represented By: Susan S. Erdelyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Augustine
Represented By: Susan S. Erdelyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?