Perez et al v. Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois
Plaintiff: Andrew Perez and Tanya Moran
Defendant: Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 3:2020cv00986
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tanya Moran, Andrew Perez. (Hinnant, Ty)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois. (Worley, Steven)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois. Related case(s): No (Worley, Steven)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Amended Complaint by Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois.(Worley, Steven)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-0937 filed in State Court on 03/10/2020. filed by Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 State Court COMPLAINT, #8 State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Worley, Steven)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Defendant to remedy the jurisdictional deficiencies noted in this order on or before September 28, 2020, or this case will be remanded. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/9/2020. (AMP)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed in State Court) against Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois with Jury Demand. filed by Andrew Perez, Tanya Moran.(AEJ)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Filing Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Worley, Steven)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-986-J-39JBT. (SJB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-0937 filed in State Court on 03/10/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17263925 filed by Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 State Court COMPLAINT, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Worley, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Perez
Represented By: Ty E.G. Hinnant
Represented By: Amanda J. Woods
Represented By: Michael Bradford Stackhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Moran
Represented By: Ty E.G. Hinnant
Represented By: Amanda J. Woods
Represented By: Michael Bradford Stackhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Steven L. Worley
Represented By: Mark Edward Pionessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?