Douglas v. Ventus Property, LLC
Appellee: Ventus Property, LLC
Appellant: Jonathan Frederick Douglas
Case Number: 3:2020cv00990
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Jonathan Frederick Douglas. (Attachments: #1 3-20-bk-1804_2_000036_Notice_of_Appeal, #2 3-20-bk-1804_3_000032_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Relief_From_Stay_by_Ventus_Properties_LLC, #3 3-20-bk-1804_4_000051_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Debtor_Jonath, #4 3-20-bk-1804_5_Docket, #5 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000021_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Damian_Waldman_on_behalf_of_Creditor, #6 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000022_Part_2_Exhibit, #7 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000022_Part_3_Exhibit, #8 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000022_Part_4_Exhibit, #9 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000023_Order_Abating_Motion_For_Relief_From_Stay_filed_by_Ventus_Properties_LLC, #10 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000027_Objection_to_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay_of_Ventus_Properties_LLC_Filed_by_Debtor_Jonatha, #11 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000028_Notice_and_Order_Scheduling_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Relief_from_the_Stay_Filed_b, #12 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000029_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Notice_and_Order_Scheduling_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_R, #13 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000030_Response_to_Debtors_objection_to_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay_Filed_by_Damian_Waldman_on_b, #14 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000031_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_WITNESSES_EVIDENCE_RULING_Prelimin, #15 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000033_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Order_Granting_Ventus_Property_LLCs_Motion_for_Relief_from_Aut, #16 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000035_Appeal_Cover_Sheet_Filed_by_Debtor_Jonathan_Frederick_Douglas, #17 3-20-bk-1804_Docket_000044_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_on_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay_To_purch)(CP)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1(Bankruptcy Appeal). Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/8/2020. (CKS)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED Bankruptcy Transmittal Amendment to #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal. (SJW)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Damian Waldman on behalf of Ventus Property, LLC (Waldman, Damian)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Jonathan Frederick Douglas. Bankruptcy Court case number 3-20-bk-01804-JAF. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 8/27/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SJW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. Ventus Property, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ventus Property, LLC
Represented By: Damian Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jonathan Frederick Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?