Woodard v. Wallace et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Woodard
Defendant: S R Griffis, D C Phillips and Tapia M Wallace
Case Number: 3:2020cv00991
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 JUDGMENT That pursuant to the Court's order entered September 30, 2020 this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/30/2020. (KKH)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice; with directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 9/30/2020. (JND)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2020. (MD)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Melvin Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(KKH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSFER IN from the Norther District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Richardson. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-991-TJC-MCR. (KKH)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00311. File received electronically
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The #5 report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as this Court's opinion. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. The Clerk must take all steps to effect the transfer and close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/31/2020. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
August 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. No Objection filed. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), it is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 7/29/20. R&R flag set. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/26/2020. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 28, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #4 Notice of Change of Address. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by MELVIN WOODARD. Generic pleading with new address of RMC, P O Box 628, Lake Butler, Fl 32054. Changed from COLUMBIA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ANNEX, 216 SE CORRECTIONS WAY, LAKE CITY, FL 32025. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
June 15, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #2 Florida Department of Corrections Trust Fund Account Statement #1 Complaint. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Florida Department of Corrections Trust Fund Account Statement by MELVIN WOODARD (rcb)**Plaintiff did not forward IFP Motion** [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MELVIN WOODARD. (rcb)**No service copy provided** [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. Wallace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S R Griffis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D C Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tapia M Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?