D'amico v. Inch et al
Plaintiff: Steven F. D'Amico
Defendant: Mark Inch, Officer McGee, C/O Deas, Joseph Edwards, Unknown Dept. Staff and J. Eckert
Case Number: 3:2020cv00992
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
2 Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER of special appointment; directing service of process upon Defendants; notice to Plaintiff; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/27/2020. (CAW)
October 13, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Steven F. D'Amico re #25 Order directing compliance (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(BGR)
October 2, 2020 Filing 27 Case Reassigned to Judge Marcia Morales Howard. New case number: 3:20-cv-992-J-34MCR. Judge Timothy J. Corrigan no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 1.03(d), this case is transferred to the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard, United States District Judge, with her consent. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 10/1/2020. (JLD)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing Plaintiff to comply by 10/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/23/2020. (JLD)
September 11, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2020. (MD)
September 3, 2020 Filing 23 TRANSFER IN from the Norther District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Richardson. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-992-TJC-MCR. (KKH)
September 3, 2020 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00444. File received electronically
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The magistrate judge's report and recommendation (ECF No. #20) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order of the court. The clerk shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 8/31/2020. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
August 28, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. No Objection Filed. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 7/30/20. R&R flag set. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/27/2020. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #19 THIRD Amended Complaint. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against J. ECKERT and UNKNOWN DEPT. STAFF, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The Report and Recommendation, ECF No. #16, is VACATED. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form and a copy of the prior Order, ECF No. #15, so Plaintiff has all he needs to file a third amended complaint. Plaintiff has until 8/17/2020, to file a third amended civil rights complaint. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's third amended complaint or no later than 8/17/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 7/17/20. R&R flag set. (blb) *Form & Order #15 Provided* [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 17, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #17 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (kjw) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #17 Objection to Report and Recommendations (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 17 OBJECTION to #16 Report and Recommendations by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 VACATED per #18 ORDER:REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court Order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/30/20. R&R flag set. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/28/2020. (blb) Modified on 7/17/2020 (blb). [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
June 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #15 Order. Clerk of Court to return file upon receipt of Plaintiff's third amended complaint or no later than 6/8/2020. No Amended Complaint filed. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file a third amended complaint. Plaintiff has until 6/8/2020, to file a third amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on the court form. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's third amended complaint or no later than 6/8/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/6/20. (blb) *Form Provided* [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
May 4, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #14 Second Amended Complaint. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against ECKERT, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (blb) (Main Document 14 replaced on 5/5/2020) (blb). [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Set Deadlines per ORDER #13: Notify Chambers on 6/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2020. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for an enlargement of time, ECF No. #11, is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until June 1, 2020, to file a second amended civil rights complaint as previously directed. ECF No. #9. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's second amended complaint or no later than June 1, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/27/20. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
April 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #12 Notice to the court. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO THE COURT by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (blb) *updated address from WAKULLA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 110 MELALUECA DRIVE, CRAWFORDVILLE, FL 32327 to LIBERTY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 11064 NW DEMSEY BARRON ROAD, BRISTOL, FL 32321* [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
April 9, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Enlargement of time to file second amended complaint by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/3/2020. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:19cv444-WS/MAF. [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file a second amended complaint. Plaintiff has until 4/27/2020, to file a second amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on court forms. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's second amended complaint or no later than 4/27/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/24/20. (blb) *Forms provided as Directed* [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
December 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Amended Complaint. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #4, is GRANTED to the extent the filing fee does not have to be prepaid. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order with appropriate cover letter, to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint or no later than 12/17/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 12/9/20. (blb) Order and Cover Letter sent as Directed* [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file the amended complaint as explained above. Plaintiff shall have until 12/17/2019, to file an amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on court forms. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint or no later than 12/17/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 11/18/19. (blb) *Forms provided as Directed* [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
November 6, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Notice of Change of Address. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by STEVEN F D'AMICO from RECEPTION AND MEDICAL CENTER, PO BOX 628, LAKE BUTLER, FL 32054 to WAKULLA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 110 MELALEUCA DRIVE, CRAWFORDVILLE, FL 32327. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
October 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application packet for requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until 10/15 /2019, to either: (1) file a motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis, supported by a computer printout of the transactions in Plaintiffs inmate bank account for the 6- month period of time preceding the initiation of this case, or (2) pay the full amount of the filing fee ($400.00 if paid in full). The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 10/15/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 09/12/2019. (rcb)***IFP Motion mailed as directed***[Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
September 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (blb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (blb)*No copies, No fee paid, No IFP* (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/5/2020) (blb). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/5/2020) (blb). [Transferred from flnd on 9/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'amico v. Inch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dept. Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven F. D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?