Woodard v. Bassa
Plaintiff: Melvin Woodard
Defendant: Medical Director RMC and R. Bassa
Case Number: 3:2020cv01016
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/14/2020. (KEM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/11/2020. (CAW)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Melvin Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Trust Account Statement)(AEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R. Bassa, Medical Director RMC filed by Melvin Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. Bassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Director RMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?