Kovacic v. Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut et al
Plaintiff: Senada Kovacic
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation Long Term Disability Plan and Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut
Case Number: 3:2020cv01143
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
2 Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Berger, Erik)
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut, Bank of America Corporation Long Term Disability Plan.(Fordin, Jonathan)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint Due to Current Public Health Situation. Defendants shall have up to and including 11/24/2020 to respond to the Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 9). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/5/2020. (MDC)
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut, Bank of America Corporation Long Term Disability Plan. Related case(s): no (Fordin, Jonathan)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice by Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut, Bank of America Corporation Long Term Disability Plan identifying Other Affiliate Shutts & Bowen LLP, Other Affiliate Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan, Other Affiliate Jonathan M. Fordin for Bank of America Corporation Long Term Disability Plan; Other Affiliate AETNA Inc., Other Affiliate Shutts & Bowen LLP, Other Affiliate Jonathan M. Fordin for Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut.. (Fordin, Jonathan)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut, Bank of America Corporation Long Term Disability Plan. (Fordin, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut, Bank of America Corporation Long Term Disability Plan filed by Senada Kovacic.(Berger, Erik) Counsel notified to include full case number on all pleadings. Modified on 11/4/2020 (KEM).
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2(ERISA). Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/21/2020. (CKS)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service as to Aetna Life Insurance Company of Connecticut executed on 10/12/2020 by Senada Kovacic (Berger, Erik) Modified docket text on 10/16/2020 (KEM).
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Senada Kovacic. (Berger, Erik)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 3:20-cv-1143-J-39JRK. Judge Marcia Morales Howard no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of recusal. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/8/2020. (JW)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut & Bank of America Corporation Long Term Disability Plan. (BGR)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-1143-J-34JRK. (SJB)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17402199) filed by Senada Kovacic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Berger, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kovacic v. Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Jonathan M. Fordin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, of Hartford, Connecticut
Represented By: Jonathan M. Fordin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senada Kovacic
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?