Jolly et al v. Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS et al
Plaintiff: Shawn O'Shell, Cheryl Jolly, Charles Drysdale, Holly Reed, Nicholas Gettler, Angela Masci, Shannon Miller, Amy Lee, Wesley MIller, Paul Masci, Amanda Banks, Kristopher Jolly, Malissa O'Shell, Samuel L. Banks, William Reed, Sarah Simmons, Landon Simmons, Matthew Cipriani and Jeremy Lee
Defendant: Horizon Terminal Services, LLC., Grimaldi Deep Sea S.P.A., Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS, Hoegh Autoliners Management AS, SSA Atlantic, LLC and Hoegh Autoliners, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01150
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Amanda Banks, Samuel L. Banks, Matthew Cipriani, Charles Drysdale, Nicholas Gettler, Kristopher Jolly, Cheryl Jolly, Amy Lee, Jeremy Lee, Wesley MIller, Angela Masci, Paul Masci, Shannon Miller, Malissa O'Shell, Shawn O'Shell, Holly Reed, William Reed, Landon Simmons, Sarah Simmons. (Richard, Benjamin)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amanda Banks, Samuel L. Banks, Matthew Cipriani, Charles Drysdale, Nicholas Gettler, Kristopher Jolly, Cheryl Jolly, Amy Lee, Jeremy Lee, Wesley MIller, Angela Masci, Paul Masci, Shannon Miller, Malissa O'Shell, Shawn O'Shell, Holly Reed, William Reed, Landon Simmons, Sarah Simmons. (Richard, Benjamin)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 First MOTION to Amend Motion to Dismiss filed by Amanda Banks, Samuel L. Banks, Matthew Cipriani, Charles Drysdale, Nicholas Gettler, Kristopher Jolly, Cheryl Jolly, Amy Lee, Jeremy Lee, Wesley MIller, Angela Masci, Paul Masci, Shannon Miller, Malissa O'Shell, Shawn O'Shell, Holly Reed, William Reed, Landon Simmons, Sarah Simmons. (Richard, Benjamin)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OBJECTION re #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction by Hoegh Autoliners Management AS, Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS by Hoegh Autoliners Management AS, Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS. (Moseley, James)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SSA Atlantic, LLC. (Baiad, Todd)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Grimaldi Deep Sea S.P.A.. (Pope, David)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REQUEST for oral argument re #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction by Hoegh Autoliners, Inc.. (Conner, Timothy)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hoegh Autoliners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Conner, Timothy)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Horizon Terminal Services, LLC.. (Volk, Brandon)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE entry for the motion hearing held on 11/19/2020 before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale: Judge Barksdale heard arguments on #33 the plaintiffs' motion to examine ship. (digital) (ASL)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hoegh Autoliners, Inc.. (Conner, Timothy)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying #33 the plaintiffs' emergency motion to permit inspection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 11/19/2020. (BLW)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Hoegh Autoliners Management AS, Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS. (Moseley, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Modified on 11/20/2020, to edit text) (BGR).
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Examine Ship filed by Hoegh Autoliners Management AS, Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS. (Moseley, James)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE scheduling a telephone hearing to discuss #33 the plaintiffs' motion to examine ship for 11/19/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Counsel should call (888) 684-8852 at least five minutes before the start time. The access code is 1103539; the security code is 0004.(ASL)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Emergency MOTION to Examine Ship by All Plaintiffs. (Slater, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Modified on 11/19/2020, to edit text) (BGR).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal filed by Amanda Banks, Samuel L. Banks, Matthew Cipriani, Charles Drysdale, Nicholas Gettler, Kristopher Jolly, Cheryl Jolly, Amy Lee, Jeremy Lee, Wesley MIller, Angela Masci, Paul Masci, Shannon Miller, Malissa O'Shell, Shawn O'Shell, Holly Reed, William Reed, Landon Simmons, Sarah Simmons. (Richard, Benjamin)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal by Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of P. Tamasitis)(Moseley, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by Horizon Terminal Services, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal of Filing Amended Declaration of Patrick Tamasitis (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Declaration of Patrick Tamasitis)(Volk, Brandon)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice from Port, #2 Exhibit Insurance (redacted to remove amounts))(Richard, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/6/2020. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for today, November 6, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will separately provide participants with the call-in information. (JW)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER striking #19 and #22 Notices of Joinder. Defendants Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. and Horizon Terminal Services, LLC shall have up to and including November 19, 2020, to file proper motions to dismiss, if they so choose. Defendants Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS and Hoegh Autoliners Management AS shall have up to and including November 19, 2020, to file an amended motion to dismiss which sets forth the entirety of their arguments, if they so choose. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 11/5/2020. (MHM)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amanda Banks, Samuel L. Banks, Matthew Cipriani, Charles Drysdale, Nicholas Gettler, Kristopher Jolly, Cheryl Jolly, Amy Lee, Jeremy Lee, Wesley MIller, Angela Masci, Paul Masci, Shannon Miller, Malissa O'Shell, Shawn O'Shell, Holly Reed, William Reed, Landon Simmons, Sarah Simmons. (Richard, Benjamin)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion to Strike or For More Definite Statement filed by Amanda Banks, Samuel L. Banks, Matthew Cipriani, Charles Drysdale, Nicholas Gettler, Kristopher Jolly, Cheryl Jolly, Amy Lee, Jeremy Lee, Wesley MIller, Angela Masci, Paul Masci, Shannon Miller, Malissa O'Shell, Shawn O'Shell, Holly Reed, William Reed, Landon Simmons, Sarah Simmons. (Richard, Benjamin)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for More Definite Statement and/or to Strike filed by Amanda Banks, Samuel L. Banks, Matthew Cipriani, Charles Drysdale, Nicholas Gettler, Kristopher Jolly, Cheryl Jolly, Amy Lee, Jeremy Lee, Wesley MIller, Angela Masci, Paul Masci, Shannon Miller, Malissa O'Shell, Shawn O'Shell, Holly Reed, William Reed, Landon Simmons, Sarah Simmons. (Richard, Benjamin)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JOINDER in motion by Horizon Terminal Services, LLC. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for More Definite Statement and/or to Strike filed by Grimaldi Deep Sea S.P.A., #16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion to Strike or For More Definite Statement filed by Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS, Hoegh Autoliners Management AS, #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SSA Atlantic, LLC . (Volk, Brandon) (Modified on 11/6/2020, STRICKEN per Order #26 ) (BGR).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED Notice re #20 Notice of Appearance and Designation of E-mail Addresses by Horizon Terminal Services, LLC. (Massee, Jules) (Modified on 10/23/2020, to edit text) (BGR).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance and Designation of E-mail Addresses by Jules Victor Massee on behalf of Horizon Terminal Services, LLC. (Massee, Jules) (Modified on 10/23/2020, to edit text) (BGR).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JOINDER in motion by Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for More Definite Statement and/or to Strike filed by Grimaldi Deep Sea S.P.A., #16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion to Strike or For More Definite Statement filed by Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS, Hoegh Autoliners Management AS, #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SSA Atlantic, LLC . (Conner, Timothy) (Modified on 11/6/2020, STRICKEN per Order #26 ) (BGR).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REQUEST for oral argument re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SSA Atlantic, LLC. (Keene, Dennis)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SSA Atlantic, LLC. (Keene, Dennis)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion to Strike or For More Definite Statement by Hoegh Autoliners Management AS, Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS. (Moseley, James)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for More Definite Statement and/or to Strike by Grimaldi Deep Sea S.P.A.. (Pope, David)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 SSA Atlantic, LLC's motion asking the Court to allow Todd Baiad, Esquire, to specially appear to represent it and directing him to register with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system by completing the E-Filer Registration Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/20/2020. (ASL)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Amended MOTION for Todd M. Baiad to appear pro hac vice by SSA Atlantic, LLC. (Keene, Dennis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing SSA Atlantic, LLC, to supplement by 10/23/2020 #7 its motion asking the Court to allow Todd Baiad, Esquire, to specially appear to represent it with information as required by Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/16/2020. (ASL)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 the defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time. The defendants must respond to #5 the amended complaint by October 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/16/2020. (BLW)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Conner on behalf of Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (Conner, Timothy)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Amended Complaint by Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS. (Moseley, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Todd M. Baiad to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17419879 for $150 by SSA Atlantic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Certification)(Keene, Dennis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis B. Keene on behalf of SSA Atlantic, LLC (Keene, Dennis)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(RH) (Originally filed in State Court) Modified on 10/13/2020 (RH).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Pope on behalf of Grimaldi Deep Sea S.P.A. (Pope, David)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Thiel on behalf of Grimaldi Deep Sea S.P.A. (Thiel, Eric)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-1150-J-34PDB. (SJB)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-004974 filed in State Court on September 1, 2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17411293 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #7 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Amended Complaint, #8 State Court Other Documents State Court Other Documents)(Moseley, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jolly et al v. Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Terminal Services, LLC.
Represented By: James Francis Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: Jules Victor Massee
Represented By: Brandon Pavel Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grimaldi Deep Sea S.P.A.
Represented By: Eric C. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: David F. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoegh Autoliners Shipping AS
Represented By: James Francis Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: Shea Michael Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoegh Autoliners Management AS
Represented By: James Francis Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: Shea Michael Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Atlantic, LLC
Represented By: James Francis Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis B. Keene
Represented By: Todd M. Baiad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoegh Autoliners, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy J. Conner
Represented By: Michael Manuel Gropper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn O'Shell
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Jolly
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Drysdale
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Reed
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Gettler
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Masci
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Miller
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lee
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley MIller
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Masci
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Banks
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Jolly
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malissa O'Shell
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel L. Banks
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Reed
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Simmons
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landon Simmons
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Cipriani
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Lee
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?