Cogdell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tammarow Valintino Cogdell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2020cv01304
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 12/14/2020 by Tammarow Valintino Cogdell as to Regional Chief Counsel of Social Security Administration. (BGR)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 12/17/2020 by Tammarow Valintino Cogdell as to U.S. Attorney's Office. (BGR)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 12/14/2020 by Tammarow Valintino Cogdell as to U.S. Attorney General. (BGR)
November 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RH)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tammarow Valintino Cogdell. Related case(s): NO (Harris, Suzanne)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), that the Court construes as a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/19/2020. (MDC)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (BGR)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-1304-J-34JRK. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (SJB)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tammarow Valintino Cogdell. (Harris, Suzanne)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Tammarow Valintino Cogdell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, Suzanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cogdell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammarow Valintino Cogdell
Represented By: Suzanne Lynn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?