King et al v. Anthem, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd King and Jennifer Velez
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Anthem, Inc., Florida Blue, Blue Cross of California, Health Options, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Companies Inc., Anthem UM Services, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross, Advantage Sales & Marketing, LLC, Blue Cross of California doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01340
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Doc 14 and MOTION to Strike the Demand for a Jury Trial by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Furman, Wendy) Modified to edit text on 1/21/2021 (KKH).
January 8, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS issued as to Advantage Sales & Marketing, LLC, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. (JDR)
January 8, 2021 Filing 20 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Todd King, Jennifer Velez. (Disston, David)
January 8, 2021 Filing 19 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Todd King, Jennifer Velez. (Disston, David)
January 8, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Todd King, Jennifer Velez. (Disston, David)
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Todd King, Jennifer Velez. (Disston, David) (Modified on 1/8/2021 counsel notified to submit proposed summons on AO 440 form) (JDR).
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Todd King, Jennifer Velez. (Disston, David) (Modified on 1/8/2021 counsel notified to submit proposed summons on AO 440 form) (JDR).
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Todd King, Jennifer Velez. (Disston, David) (Modified on 1/8/2021 counsel notified to submit proposed summons on AO 440 form) (JDR).
January 6, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advantage Sales & Marketing, LLC, Blue Cross of California, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: #4 Complaint filed by Jennifer Velez, Todd King.(Smith, Shane)
December 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' #4 Complaint by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Companies Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthem UM Services, Inc., Anthem, Inc., Blue Cross of California. (Shure, Danielle) (Modified on 1/4/2021 edit docket relationship) (JDR).
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, and Anthem UM Services, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for an Additional Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The above-named Defendants shall have up to and including 12/30/2020 to file (a) response(s) to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. No. 4). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 12/16/2020. (MDC)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. (Conner, Timothy)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Additional Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Order on Motion for Extension of time to Answer by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Companies Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthem UM Services, Inc., Anthem, Inc.. (Furman, Wendy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Modified on 12/16/2020 to edit docket text) (JDR).
December 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/11/2020. (MD)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance and Designation of email address by Timothy J. Conner on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc. (Conner, Timothy) (Modified on 12/3/2020 to edit docket text) (JDR).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s and Health Options, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. and Health Options, Inc. shall have up to and including 12/16/2020 to file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. No. 4). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 12/2/2020. (MDC)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to re #4 Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. (Dixon, Justin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Modified on 12/3/2020 to edit docket text) (JDR).
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Defendants Anthem, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, and Anthem UM Services, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint; response(s) to Complaint due 12/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/27/2020. (KAW)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand originally filed on 10/13/2020 in the Seventh Judicial Circuit, St. Johns County, case number CA20-1103 filed by Jennifer Velez, Todd King.(KKH)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Companies Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthem UM Services, Inc., Anthem, Inc., Blue Cross of California. (Furman, Wendy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified to edit docket entry relationship and text on 11/27/2020 (KKH).
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-1340-J-32JRK. (SJB)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Johns County Circuit Court, case number CA20-1103 filed in State Court on November 13, 2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17594823 filed by Anthem, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Companies Inc., Anthem UM Services, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Exhibit 3 - Traditional PPO Plan Benefit Booklet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Furman, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Anthem, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Conner
Represented By: Justin Wade Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy L. Furman
Represented By: Danielle E. Shure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California
Represented By: Wendy L. Furman
Represented By: Danielle E. Shure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Options, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Conner
Represented By: Justin Wade Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy L. Furman
Represented By: Danielle E. Shure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Companies Inc.
Represented By: Wendy L. Furman
Represented By: Danielle E. Shure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem UM Services, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy L. Furman
Represented By: Danielle E. Shure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross
Represented By: Wendy L. Furman
Represented By: Danielle E. Shure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Sales & Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California doing business as Anthem Blue Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Wendy L. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd King
Represented By: Shane M. Smith
Represented By: David Disston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Velez
Represented By: Shane M. Smith
Represented By: David Disston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?