United States of America v. $306,242.49 seized from Fifth Third Bank Business Elite Checking Account Number 7450306241 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $306,242.49 seized from Fifth Third Bank Business Elite Checking Account Number 7450306241, $4,850.00 in United States Currency, $15,087.00 seized from Fifth Third Bank Essential Checking Account Number 7450464370 and $10,821.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Stevey L. Barnes
Case Number: 3:2020cv01350
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James R Klindt
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
2 Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 841 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 19 CASE Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:20-cv-1350-HES-LLL. Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt no longer assigned to the case. (RH)
June 21, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of substitution of AUSA. Mai Tran substituting for Bonnie A. Glober, Assistant U.S. Attorney. (Tran, Mai)
June 15, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Stevey L. Barnes. (AEP)
May 24, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United States of America. (Tran, Mai)
February 24, 2021 Filing 15 US Marshal 285 form for (Treasury Process Receipt & Return form) seizure of $306,242.49 per Warrant of Arrest in rem. (Glober, Bonnie)
February 24, 2021 Filing 14 US Marshal 285 form for (Treasury Process Receipt & Return form) seizure of $15,087.00 per Warrant of Arrest in rem. (Glober, Bonnie)
February 24, 2021 Filing 13 US Marshal 285 form for (Treasury Process Receipt & Return form) seizure of $306,242.49 per Warrant of Arrest in rem. (Glober, Bonnie) Modified on 2/24/2021 - filed in error per AUSA. (AEJ)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Date(s) of publication December 21, 2020 through January 19, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Advertisement details)(Glober, Bonnie)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 VERIFIED Claim for Seized Property by Stevey L. Barnes. (AEJ)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for forfeiture in rem by Stevey L. Barnes.(AEJ)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 US Marshal 285 form for the amount of $4,850 in United States Currency was administratively seized on 2/18/2020; individually seized on 1/19/2021. (KEM)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 US Marshal 285 form for the amount of $10,821 in United States Currency was administratively seized on 2/18/2020; individually seized on 1/19/2021. (KEM)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 United States of America's Motion for Issuance of Warrants of Arrest in Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/7/2021. (BHC)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant In Rem by United States of America. (Glober, Bonnie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $306,242.49 seized from Fifth Third Bank Business Elite Checking Account Number 7450306241, $15,087.00 seized from Fifth Third Bank Essential Checking Account Number 7450464370, $10,821.00 in United States Currency, $4,850.00 in United States Currency filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $306,242.49 seized from Fifth Third Bank Business Elite Checking Account Number 7450306241 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $306,242.49 seized from Fifth Third Bank Business Elite Checking Account Number 7450306241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,850.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,087.00 seized from Fifth Third Bank Essential Checking Account Number 7450464370
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,821.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bonnie Ames Glober
Represented By: Mai Tran
Represented By: Bonnie Ames Glober AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stevey L. Barnes
Represented By: Nah-Deh Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?