Toomey v. Ripple Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Toomey
Defendant: Ripple Labs, Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse and XRP II, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00093
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Westcot, Sarah)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER construing as a motion and granting #22 Joint Stipulation Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2) Allowing Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint, and Proposing Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Forthcoming Motion to Dismiss. The Court approves the Stipulation and adopts the deadlines set forth therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 3/12/2021. (TAM)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Obergfell. If Mr. Obergfell has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 3/12/2021. (TAM)
March 11, 2021 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Amend Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(A)(2) allowing Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint, and proposing Briefing Schedule for Defendants' forthcoming Motion To Dismiss by Tyler Toomey. (Westcot, Sarah) Modified docket text on 3/12/2021 (KEM). Modified event type and docket text per Chambers on 3/12/2021 (KEM).
March 10, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Amended Complaint by Tyler Toomey. (Westcot, Sarah)
March 10, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Andrew J. Obergfell to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17986575 for $150 by Tyler Toomey. (Westcot, Sarah) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
March 3, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ripple Labs, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ripple Labs, Inc., Other Affiliate XRP II, LLC, Other Affiliate Bradley Garlinghouse for Ripple Labs, Inc... (Marshall, Damien)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply With Former Local Rule 4.04(b). Plaintiff need not file a motion for class certification until further order of the Court. The parties shall propose a class certification briefing schedule in their case management report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 2/18/2021. (TAM)
February 17, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Damien Jerome Marshall on behalf of Ripple Labs, Inc. (Marshall, Damien)
February 16, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion To Extend Deadline To Move For Class Certification by Tyler Toomey. (Westcot, Sarah) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint on or before March 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 2/9/2021. (TAM)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs, Inc., XRP II, LLC. (Bugni, Lisa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Bugni on behalf of Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs, Inc., XRP II, LLC (Bugni, Lisa)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Tyler Toomey (Westcot, Sarah)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Tyler Toomey (Westcot, Sarah)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Tyler Toomey (Westcot, Sarah)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 01/28/2021 by Tyler Toomey as to Bradley Garlinghouse. (Westcot, Sarah)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 01/26/2021 by Tyler Toomey as to XRP II, LLC. (Westcot, Sarah)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 01/26/2021 by Tyler Toomey as to Ripple Labs, Inc.. (Westcot, Sarah)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases listed in Rule 3.02(d). These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT pursuant to the Court's 1/27/21 Order against Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs, Inc., XRP II, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Tyler Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westcot, Sarah)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STRIKING #1 Complaint. Plaintiff shall have until February 8, 2021, to file an amended complaint that conforms with the directives in this Order, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. Failure to do so can result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/27/2021. (AMP)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs, Inc., XRP II, LLC. (KEM)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-0093-J-39JBT. (SJB)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs, Inc., XRP II, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17808431) filed by Tyler Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Westcot, Sarah) Modified on 1/28/2021 as to Stricken per #4 Order. (KEM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toomey v. Ripple Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ripple Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Bugni
Represented By: Damien Jerome Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Garlinghouse
Represented By: Lisa Bugni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XRP II, LLC
Represented By: Lisa Bugni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Toomey
Represented By: Sarah Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?