Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.439 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: James B. Goodwin, 0.439 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida, Autovest Financial Services, LLC, American Telephone & Telegraph Company, Unknown Owners, Katherine Smith Ford and Unknown Owners, if any
Case Number: 3:2021cv00225
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 35 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Unknown Owners, if any (BGR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Unknown Owners, if any by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
April 29, 2021 Filing 33 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Disclaimer of Interest by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 20, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Condemnation, #1 Complaint, , ANSWER to #3 Notice of Condemnation, #1 Complaint, by Katherine Smith Ford.(Wade, Russell)
April 16, 2021 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #30 Order, . (Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OMNIBUS ORDER setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the motions is set for June 2, 2021, at 3:00 P.M. before the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2021. (JHC)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 AT&T's second unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #1 the complaint. AT&T must respond to the complaint by April 28, 2021. As explained, see Doc. 19, filings must comply with the Local Rules that went into effect on February 1, 2021, including Local Rule 1.08 governing typography (Times New Roman is permitted if the main text is at least 14-point, with other requirements) and Local Rule 3.01(g) (certification must be under the heading "Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on April 14, 2021. (ASL)
April 13, 2021 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by American Telephone & Telegraph Company. (Boese, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
April 13, 2021 Filing 27 PROOF of publication filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Newspaper: Union County Times Date(s) of publication 03/25/2021; 04/01/2021; 04/08/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 8, 2021 Filing 26 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 8, 2021 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Autovest Financial Services, LLC (BGR)
April 8, 2021 Filing 24 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to James B. Goodwin (BGR)
April 8, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Autovest Financial Services, LLC, James B. Goodwin by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Katherine Smith Ford's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #1 the complaint. Ford must respond to the complaint by April 20, 2021, if no omnibus order is entered setting a different deadline. Future filings must comply with the Local Rules that went into effect on February 1, 2021, including Local Rule 1.08 governing typography (typeface must be Book Antiqua, Calisto MT, Century Schoolbook, Georgia, or Palatino; Times New Roman is permitted if the main text is at least 14-point, with other requirements). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/7/2021. (KNR)
April 6, 2021 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Katherine Smith Ford. (Wade, Russell) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
April 2, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 AT&T's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #1 the complaint. AT&T must respond to the complaint by April 14, 2021, if no omnibus order is entered setting a different deadline. Future filings must comply with the Local Rules that went into effect on February 1, 2021, including Local Rule 1.08 governing typography (typeface must be Book Antiqua, Calisto MT, Century Schoolbook, Georgia, or Palatino; Times New Roman is permitted if the main text is at least 14-point, with other requirements). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/1/2021. (KNR)
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by American Telephone & Telegraph Company. (Boese, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
March 30, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF of service executed on 3/10/2021 as to Autovest Financial Services by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/30/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 26, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF of service executed on 3/16/2021 as to Katherine Smith Ford by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/26/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 26, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF of service executed on 3/16/2021 as to James B. Goodwin by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/26/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 19, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of counsel of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service as to American Telephone & Telegraph Company on 3/10/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/16/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 Summary Judgment Notice and Courtesy Copies re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/8/2021. (BGR)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners, LP for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth Porter re: #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Diego Aponte re: #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Adam Broad re: #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-225-MMH-PDB. (SMS)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17970556) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.439 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.439 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autovest Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Telephone & Telegraph Company
Represented By: Andrew Benjamin Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Smith Ford
Represented By: Russell Alexander Wade, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners, if any
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?