Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.182 Acres of Land in Putnman County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: FBT Mortgage LLC, 0.182 Acres of Land in Putnman County, Florida, John O. Pinkney, Unknown Owners and Carley Pinkney
Case Number: 3:2021cv00227
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Carley Pinkney, John O. Pinkney. (Brigham, Andrew)
May 6, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Carley Pinkney, John O. Pinkney. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exh A. Initial Offer dated 12.10.20 PUTN-016.05 Pinkney, #2 Exhibit Exh B. Durrance App Rpt 10.26.20 PUTN-016.05 Pinkney)(Brigham, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Unknown Owners by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
April 27, 2021 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to FBT Mortgage LLC (KKH)
April 21, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Carley Pinkney, John O. Pinkney.(Brigham, Andrew)
April 16, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #21 Order, . (Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF of publication filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Newspaper: Palatka Daily News Date(s) of publication 03/25/2021; 04/01/2021; 04/08/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OMNIBUS ORDER setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the motions is set for June 2, 2021, at 3:00 P.M. before the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2021. (JHC)
April 13, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Clerk's Default against FBT Mortgage LLC by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
April 8, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendants, John and Carley Pinkney's, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on or before April 21, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/1/2021. (TAM)
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, and Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Carley Pinkney, John O. Pinkney. (Brigham, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
March 26, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF of service as to Carley Pinkney, executed 3/13/21 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/26/2021 (KKH).
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of service as to FBT Mortgage, LLC executed on 3/18/21 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/23/2021 (KKH).
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF of service as to John O. Pinkney, executed on 3/13/21 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/23/2021 (KKH).
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/22/2021 (KKH).
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-227-TJC-JBT. (LRB)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17972248) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.182 Acres of Land in Putnman County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBT Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.182 Acres of Land in Putnman County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O. Pinkney
Represented By: Edward Scott Copeland
Represented By: Andrew Prince Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carley Pinkney
Represented By: Edward Scott Copeland
Represented By: Andrew Prince Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?