Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 1.603 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: Christine Gordon Surles, 1.603 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida, Roshanda Gordon, Augustine Blount, Toynetta Jones, Unknown Owners, Dessie L Gordon Alexander, Sherman Vincent, Harold Gordon, Edward Beasley, Leo Gordon, Jr., Freemon Newton, Andrew English, Corine Gordon Wilson, Roosevelt Gordon, Veronica Flowers, Shantell Hollinger, Pearline Gordon Ferguson, Everlina Gordon Reed, Craig Blount, Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC, Warren Hollinger, Mary Jones, Francine Gordon and Nathaniel Gordon
Case Number: 3:2021cv00229
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sherman Vincent (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Shantell Hollinger (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Roosevelt Gordon (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pearline Gordon Ferguson (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nathaniel Gordon (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mary Jones (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Harold Gordon (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Francine Gordon (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Everlina Gordon Reed (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Edward Beasley (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dessie L Gordon Alexander (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Corine Gordon Wilson (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Christine Gordon Surles (KEM)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Craig Blount (KEM)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Edward Beasley, Craig Blount, Francine Gordon, Harold Gordon, Nathaniel Gordon, Roosevelt Gordon, Dessie L Gordon Alexander, Pearline Gordon Ferguson, Everlina Gordon Reed, Christine Gordon Surles, Corine Gordon Wilson, Shantell Hollinger, Mary Jones, Unknown Owners, Sherman Vincent by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #37 Order, . (Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROOF of publication filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Newspaper: The Lake City Reporter Date(s) of publication 03/26/2021; 04/02/2021; 04/09/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OMNIBUS ORDER setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the motions is set for June 2, 2021, at 3:00 P.M. before the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2021. (JHC)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Toynetta Jones (KEM)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Freemon Newton (KEM)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Augustine Blount (KEM)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Andrew English (KEM)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Leo Gordon, Jr. (KEM)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Roshanda Gordon (KEM)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Toynetta Jones, Freemon Newton by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Augustine Blount, Andrew English, Roshanda Gordon, Leo Gordon, Jr. by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Warren Hollinger (KEM)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Veronica Flowers (KEM)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (KEM)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Veronica Flowers, Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC, Warren Hollinger by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROOF of service as to Freemon Newton, as Personal Representative executed on 3/17/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified on to edit docket text 3/29/2021 (KEM).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of counsel of Diligent Search and the Need for Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROOF of service as to Toynetta Jones executed on 3/23/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified on 3/25/2021 to edit docket text. (KEM).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RETURN of service as to Augustine Blount executed on 3/9/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified on 3/25/2021 to edit docket text. (KEM).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RETURN of service as to Andrew English executed on 3/18/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified on 3/24/2021 as to edit docket text (KEM).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RETURN of service as to Leo Gordon executed on 3/18/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified on 3/24/2021 as to edit docket text. (KEM).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RETURN of service as to Augustine Blount executed on 3/19/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified on 3/24/2021 as to edit docket text. (KEM).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RETURN of service as to Roshanda Gordon executed on 3/18/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified on 3/24/2021 as to edit docket text (KEM).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RETURN of service as to Warren Hollinger executed on 3/11/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified docket text on 3/17/2021 (KEM).
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RETURN of service as to Veronica Flowers executed on 3/10/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified docket text on 3/17/2021 (KEM).
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN of service as to Ford Motor Credit Company executed on 3/9/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified docket text on 3/17/2021 (KEM).
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:21-cv-229-BJD-MCR. (LRB)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17973264) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 1.603 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Gordon Surles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.603 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roshanda Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augustine Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toynetta Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dessie L Gordon Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Gordon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freemon Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corine Gordon Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantell Hollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearline Gordon Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everlina Gordon Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Hollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francine Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?