Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.401 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: Alzeta Duggan, Janet Hampton, Rose Davis, Janice Mortiner, Unknown Owners, Annie Simmons, Pearlie Mae White Davis, Aaron L Davis, Cynthia Berry, Janet Ramos, Alene Bryant, Ruth Worthen, 0.401 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida, Charles Davis, Carl Davis, Timothy Davis, Alzeta lucas, Tommie L Davis, Carrie O'Neal, Aaron Davis, Jr., Corenne Brown, Tommie L. Davis, Janice Mortimer, Unknown Owners, if any and Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of the Estate of Aaron L. Davis
Case Number: 3:2021cv00230
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROOF of publication filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Newspaper: Palatka Daily News Date(s) of publication 04/01/2021; 04/08/2021; 04/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #34 Order, . (Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OMNIBUS ORDER setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the motions is set for June 2, 2021, at 3:00 P.M. before the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2021. (JHC)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Carrie O'Neal. (BGR)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Carrie O'Neal by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Janet Hampton. (BGR)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alzeta Duggan. (BGR)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ruth Worthen. (BGR)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Charles Davis. (BGR)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Corenne Brown. (BGR)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rose Davis. (BGR)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Corenne Brown, Charles Davis, Alzeta Duggan, Janet Hampton, Ruth Worthen by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Amended MOTION for Clerk's Default against Rose Davis by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Rose Davis by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROOF of service executed on 3/16/2021 as to Janet Hampton by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/29/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROOF of service executed on 3/16/2021 as to Charles Davis by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/26/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of counsel of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROOF of service executed on 3/22/2021 as to Carrie O'Neal by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 4/15/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROOF of service executed on 3/17/2021 as to Ruth Worthen by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/24/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROOF of service executed on 3/11/2021 as to Rose Davis by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/24/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROOF of service executed on 3/16/2021 as to Corenne Brown by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/24/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROOF of service executed on 3/17/2021 as to Alzeta Duggan by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/24/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summary Judgment Notice and Courtesy Copies re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/9/2021. (BGR)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:21-cv-0230-MMH-JRK. (SJB)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan, Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17974513) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.401 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alzeta Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Mortiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearlie Mae White Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alene Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Worthen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.401 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alzeta lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corenne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners, if any
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of the Estate of Aaron L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?